blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0995045 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0995045



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 167
01.09.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.09.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.08.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.08.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.08.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.05.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.05.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
13.05.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
14.12.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
14.12.2002 Description Search / examination 7
14.12.2002 Description Search / examination 7
14.12.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.12.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 17
09.08.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.08.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.06.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.05.2000 Request for change of name Search / examination 4
15.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.03.2000 Copy of the corrected international search report Search / examination 4
02.03.2000 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16
11.02.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.12.1999 Abstract Search / examination 2
14.12.1999 Annex International Searching Authority 1
14.12.1999 Annex International Searching Authority 1
14.12.1999 Annex International Searching Authority 2
14.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
14.12.1999 Description Search / examination 9
14.12.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
14.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 16
25.11.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.11.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
18.11.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 11
13.08.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
13.08.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
13.08.1999 Description International Searching Authority 9
13.08.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 3
13.08.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 1