blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995045
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002514718Global Dossier 21.05.2002A
Priority number Date
DE9901398 10.05.1999
DE19821160 12.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0995045Global Dossier 29.10.2003B1
EP0995045 26.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE9901398 10.05.1999
DE19821160 12.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59907530D 04.12.2003D1
Priority number Date
DE9901398 10.05.1999
DE59907530 10.05.1999
DE19821160 12.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6318927 20.11.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE9901398 10.05.1999
DE19821160 12.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9958864Global Dossier 02.03.2000A9
WO9958864 18.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19821160 12.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19821160 28.10.1999C1
Priority number Date
DE19821160 12.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2207957T 01.06.2004T3
Priority number Date
DE19821160 12.05.1998