Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995045

EP0995045 - FIXING SYSTEM COMPRISING A PLASTIC COVERED SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2004
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.10.2004  [2004/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NACAM Deutschland GmbH
Haldemer Strasse 2
49448 Lemförde / DE
[2000/29]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Lemförder Lenksäulen GmbH
Haldemer Strasse 2
49448 Lemförde / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÄFER, Burkhard
Moorweg 12
D-27777 Ganderkesee / DE
02 / KLUMPE, Stephan
Westerfeldstrasse 8
D-49179 Ostercappeln / DE
03 / RAUTERBERG, Thomas
Stromer Landstrasse 33b
D-28197 Bremen / DE
04 / MICHALSKI, Herniu
Wandelstrasse 29
D-28816 Brinkum / DE
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date99934457.510.05.1999
[2000/17]
WO1999DE01398
Priority number, dateDE199812116012.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19821160
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9958864
Date:18.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995045
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995045
Date:29.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16B39/34
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER TEILWEISE KUNSTSTOFFUMMANTELTEN SCHRAUBE[2000/17]
English:FIXING SYSTEM COMPRISING A PLASTIC COVERED SCREW[2000/17]
French:SYSTEME DE FIXATION COMPRENANT UNE VIS POURVUE D'UN REVETEMENT EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase15.12.1999National basic fee paid 
15.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
09.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2003Fee for grant paid
19.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US3568746  (FARONI CHARLES C, et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 2,4 *;
 [A]EP0508135  (SFS STADLER HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 41 - line 58 * * column 2, line 37 - line 54 * * figures 1,5 *;
 [A]DE4015772  (SFS STADLER HOLDING AG) [A] 1 * column 4, line 7 - line 53 * * figure 2 *