Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995044

EP0995044 - FASTENING SYSTEM FOR FIXING A MOTOR VEHICLE STEERING-COLUMN UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.01.2006  [2006/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Lenksysteme Nacam GmbH
Zum Huchtinger Bahnhof 25
28259 Bremen / DE
[2005/30]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
NACAM Deutschland GmbH
Haldemer Strasse 2
49448 Lemförde / DE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Lemförder Lenksäulen GmbH
Haldemer Strasse 2
49448 Lemförde / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MICHALSKI, Herniu
Wandelstrasse 29
D-28816 Brinkum / DE
02 / METZGER, Fabian
Kreuzweg 42
D-27751 Dlemenhorst / DE
03 / VORTMEYER, Jens
Am Bache 5
D-32361 Preussisch-Oldendorf / DE
04 / RUMPKE, Andreas
Rhienstrasse 12
D-49453 Rehden / DE
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date99934487.212.05.1999
[2000/17]
WO1999DE01435
Priority number, dateDE199812164614.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19821646
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9960280
Date:25.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995044
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995044
Date:12.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16B35/04, B62D1/16
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM ZUR FESTLEGUNG EINER KRAFTFAHRZEUGLENKSÄULENEINHEIT[2000/17]
English:FASTENING SYSTEM FOR FIXING A MOTOR VEHICLE STEERING-COLUMN UNIT[2000/17]
French:SYSTEME DE FIXATION POUR POSITIONNER UN ENSEMBLE COLONNE DE DIRECTION DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase15.12.1999National basic fee paid 
15.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
19.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2004Fee for grant paid
14.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0309344  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * column 4, line 33 - line 43 * * column 3, line 3 - line 14 * * claim 1 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [Y]US4671324  (NEILL DAVID C [US]) [Y] 1,2 * claim 1 * * figures 1A,2 *;
 [A]EP0571834  (KSB AG [DE]) [A] 3-5 * claims 1,3 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP0774399  (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4900178  (HALDRIC BERNARD [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figures 3A,4 *