Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100698

EP1100698 - AIRBAG ARRANGEMENT FOR LATERAL PROTECTION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE PASSENGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  24.07.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 16.09.2009  [2009/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault s.a.s.
13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
Renault s.a.s.
13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
RENAULT
34 Quai du Point du Jour
92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / PONCEAU, Philippe
4, rue de Pourras
F-78610 Le Perray en Yvelines / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Davies, Owen Robert Treharne
Renault sas Technocentre TCR-GRA-2-36 1 avenue du Golf
78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
[2008/05]
Application number, filing date99934816.229.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999FR01884
Priority number, dateFR1998000971429.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809714
[2001/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0006421
Date:10.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1100698
Date:23.05.2001
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100698
Date:04.10.2006
Language:FR
[2006/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/00
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2006/16]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:AIRBAGANORDNUNG ZUM KRAFTFAHRZEUGINSASSENSCHUTZ BEI SEITENAUFPRALL[2001/21]
English:AIRBAG ARRANGEMENT FOR LATERAL PROTECTION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE PASSENGER[2001/21]
French:AGENCEMENT D'UN COUSSIN GONFLABLE POUR LA PROTECTION LATERALE D'UN PASSAGER DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase30.01.2001National basic fee paid 
30.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
17.11.2003Observations by third parties
22.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2006Fee for grant paid
29.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.07.2007  24.07.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Volkswagen AG
D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Liebl, Thomas, et al
NEUBAUER - LIEBL - BIERSCHNEIDER Münchener Strasse 49
85051 Ingolstadt / DE
 [2009/38]
Former [2007/33]
Opponent(s)01  04.07.2007   
Volkswagen AG
D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Liebl, Thomas, et al
Patentanwälte Neubauer - Liebl - Bierschneider Fauststrasse 30
85051 Ingolstadt / DE
10.08.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.02.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.04.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.04.2009
09.04.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
19.04.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/35]
29.04.2009Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH03258636  ;
 [A]JPH0538993  ;
 [A]US5273309  (LAU IAN V [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * figure - * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 68 *;
 [A]WO9800316  (JOALTO DESIGN INC [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * figures 5A-6B * * abstract * * page 14, line 13 - page 15, line 10 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920220), vol. 016, no. 069, Database accession no. (M - 1212), [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930621), vol. 017, no. 324, Database accession no. (M - 1433), [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *
otherDE19515851