Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099226

EP1099226 - X-RAY FOCUSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bede Scientific Instruments Limited
Belmont Business Park
Durham DH1 1TW / GB
[2002/15]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Bede Scientific Instruments Limited
Bowburn South Industrial Estate
Bowburn Durham DH6 5AD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / LOXLEY, Neil
9 Whitesmocks Avenue
Durham DH1 4HP / GB
02 / PINA, Ladislav
Janovska 373
109 00 Prague 10 / CZ
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Murnane, Graham John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Murnane, Graham John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date99934838.623.07.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999GB02216
Priority number, dateGB1998001596823.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9815968
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0005727
Date:03.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099226
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099226
Date:23.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G21K1/06
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR FOKUSSIERUNG VON RÖNTGENSTRAHLEN[2001/20]
English:X-RAY FOCUSING APPARATUS[2001/20]
French:APPAREIL DE FOCALISATION AUX RAYONS X[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2001National basic fee paid 
22.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
20.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2006Fee for grant paid
07.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
CY23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
IT23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
GR24.11.2006
ES04.12.2006
PT24.01.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/21]AT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
IT23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
GR24.11.2006
ES04.12.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2008/18]AT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
IT23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
ES04.12.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2007/31]AT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
ES04.12.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2007/23]AT23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
ES04.12.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]US5192869  (KUMAKHOV MURADIN A [SU]) [A] 1-26 * column W *;
 [A]US5747821  (YORK BRIAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * column W *;
 [A]US5604353  (GIBSON DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * column W *;
 [A]US4525853  (KEEM JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1,20,24 * column W *;
 [A]US5222113  (THIEME JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,20,24 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH01119800
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890811), vol. 13, no. 361, [A] 1,20,24 * abstract *