Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102729

EP1102729 - PROCESS FOR TREATING BENTONITE AND PRODUCTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COLIN STEWART MINCHEM LTD.
Weaver Valley Road, Wharton Winsford
Cheshire CW7 3BU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
COLIN STEWART MINCHEM LTD.
Weaver Valley Road, Wharton
Winsford, Cheshire CW7 3BU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / KITCHING, Peter Jeffrey
3 Pintail Place
Winsford, Cheshire CW7 1LE / GB
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date99934863.416.07.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999GB02304
Priority number, dateGB1998001545017.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9815450
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003959
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1102729
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102729
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C04B33/04, C11D3/12, C11D3/00
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/22]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BENTONITE UND DESSEN PRODUKT[2001/22]
English:PROCESS FOR TREATING BENTONITE AND PRODUCTS THEREOF[2001/22]
French:PROCEDE POUR TRAITER LA BENTONITE ET PRODUITS CON US A CET EFFET[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2001National basic fee paid 
15.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
06.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2002Fee for grant paid
06.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
LU16.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/40]CY16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
LU16.07.2003
Former [2004/39]CY16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
LU16.07.2003
Former [2004/36]CY16.07.2003
FI16.07.2003
Former [2004/26]FI16.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[XDA]FR2498586  (CHIMICO G DAL CIN LAB [IT]) [XD] 1,7,8 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 3 * * claim 1 * [A] 2-6;
 [A]JPH05263359  ;
 [A]US5084428  (SUZUKI KENZI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 40 *;
 [A]US3914384  (GULLETT JAMES THOMAS) [A] 1 * column 2, line 7 - line 60 *;
 [A]GB2095274  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [A] 1 * page 3, column L, line 58 - column R, line 118 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940121), vol. 018, no. 040, Database accession no. (C - 1155), [A] 1-8 * abstract *