Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100733

EP1100733 - APPARATUS FOR SECURING AN OBTURATING DEVICE OF AN OUTLET OF A CONTAINER FOR BULK MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/21]BULK MATERIAL HANDLING APPARATUS
[2002/36]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATCON (R & D) LIMITED
Matcon House, London Road Moreton-In-Marsh
Gloucestershire GL56 0HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
MATCON (R & D) LIMITED
Matcon House, London Road
Moreton-In-Marsh, Gloucestershire GL56 0HJ / GB
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
MATCON LIMITED
Matcon House, London Road
Moreton-in-Marsh, Gloucestershire GL56 0HJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PIEPEREIT, Edward
2 Orchard View Cottages, Evenlode
Moreton-in-Marsh, Glos. GL56 0NN / GB
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Johnson, Terence Leslie , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Johnson, Terence Leslie , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London, WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2005/38]Johnson, Terence Leslie , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2003/49]Evans, Claire , et al
Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BZ / GB
Former [2001/21]Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
Edward Evans & Co., Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BX / GB
Application number, filing date99934946.723.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999GB02396
Priority number, dateGB1998001644928.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9816449
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0006469
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100733
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100733
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65D90/62, B65G69/18
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM FESTHALTEN EINES VERSCHLUSSES EINES AUSGANGS EINES BEHÄLTERS FÜR SCHÜTTGUT[2002/36]
English:APPARATUS FOR SECURING AN OBTURATING DEVICE OF AN OUTLET OF A CONTAINER FOR BULK MATERIAL[2002/36]
French:APPAREIL POUR FIXER UN OBTURATEUR DE SORTIE DE RECIPIENT POUR MATIERE EN VRAC[2002/36]
Former [2001/21]VORRICHTUNG ZUM HANDHABEN VON SCHÜTTGUT
Former [2001/21]BULK MATERIAL HANDLING APPARATUS
Former [2001/21]APPAREIL DE MANUTENTION DE MATIERE EN VRAC
Entry into regional phase29.01.2001National basic fee paid 
29.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
02.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2003Fee for grant paid
20.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.11.2004  08.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Montena SA
Chemin de la Cornache 1
1753 Matran / CH
Opponent's representative
PATWIL AG
Patentanwälte
Postfach 907
9500 Wil / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2008/36]
Opponent(s)01  27.11.2004  08.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Montena SA
Chemin de la Cornache 1
1753 Matran / CH
Opponent's representative
Büchel, von Révy & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 907
9500 Wil / CH
Former [2005/03]
Opponent(s)01  27.11.2004   
Montena SA
Chemin de la Cornache 1
1753 Matran / CH
Opponent's representative
Büchel, von Révy & Partner
Zedernpark/Bronschhoferstrasse 31, Postfach 907
9500 Wil / CH
10.01.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.11.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2006Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2006Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.04.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2008
17.04.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2008Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.11.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.02.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.10.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
26.10.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
FR03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE23.07.2004
LU23.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
PT03.08.2004
IT23.07.2005
[2010/28]
Former [2008/18]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
FR03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE23.07.2004
LU23.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
PT03.08.2004
IT23.07.2005
Former [2007/34]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
FR03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE23.07.2004
LU23.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
IT23.07.2005
Former [2007/23]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
FR03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE23.07.2004
LU23.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2006/14]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
FR03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE23.07.2004
LU23.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/46]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE23.07.2004
LU23.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
FR18.02.2005
Former [2005/23]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
LU23.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/22]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/18]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/05]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/46]AT03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9008724  (MARITIME GMC A S [NO]) [X] 1,2,10,12,13,15,18 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 14; figures 7,8 *;
 [X]DE3718428  (BRABENDER TECHNOLOGIE KG) [X] 1,2,10,11,13,18 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 37; figures 1,2 *