EP1106701 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AGAINST CANINE TRYPSIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiichi Fine Chemical Co., Ltd. 530, Chokeiji Takaoka-shi Toyama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Daiichi Fine Chemical Co., Ltd. 530, Chokeiji Takaoka-shi, Toyama / JP | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states FUJI YAKUHIN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 530, Chokeiji Takaoka-shi Toyama 933-8511 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARITANI, Takaki, Fuji Yakuhin Kogyo K.K. 530, Chokeiji Takaoka-shi, Toyama 933-8511 / JP | 02 /
ASHIDA, Yoshinori, Fuji Yakuhin Kogyo K.K. 530, Chokeiji Takaoka-shi, Toyama 933-8511 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Takatsugu 40-3, Minamiosawa 4-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0364 / JP | [2001/36] |
Former [2001/24] | 01 /
FWARITANI, Takaki, Fuji Yakuhin Kogyo K.K. 530, Chokeiji Takaoka-shi, Toyama 933-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
ASHIDA, Yoshinori, Fuji Yakuhin Kogyo K.K. 530, Chokeiji Takaoka-shi, Toyama 933-8511 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMADA, Takatsugu 40-3, Minamiosawa 4-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0364 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/24] | Helbing, Jörg, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99935112.5 | 09.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999JP04299 | Priority number, date | JP19980236609 | 10.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23660998 | JP19990063990 | 10.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6399099 | [2001/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0009739 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106701 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/08, C07K16/40, C07K16/18, C12Q1/34, G01N33/573, G01N33/577, C12N15/06 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
C12N9/6427 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP);
C07K2317/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER GERICHTET GEGEN AUS DEM HUND STAMMENDES TRYPSIN | [2001/31] | English: | MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AGAINST CANINE TRYPSIN | [2001/24] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL AGISSANT CONTRE LA TRYPSINE CANINE | [2001/24] |
Former [2001/24] | Monoklonaler Antikörper gerichtet gegen aus dem Hund stammendes Trypsin | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2001 | Translation filed | 08.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 11.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MISZCZUK-JAMSKA B ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF TRYPSINOGENS 1 AND 2 IN TWO HUMAN PANCREATIC ADENOCARCINOMA CELL LINES CFPAC-1 AND CAPAN-1", FEBS LETTERS, (1991), vol. 294, no. 3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 175 - 178, XP008040775 [X] 6-8 * page 76, column L, paragraphs 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(91)80662-M | [A] - SMITH MARK A ET AL, "Alpha-1-Trypsin immunoreactivity in Alzheimer disease", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1993), vol. 193, no. 2, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 579 - 584, XP002311640 [A] 1-9 * page 580, paragraphs 3-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1993.1663 | International search | [X] - PINSKY S.D. ET AL., "Differential regulation of trypsinogen messenger RNA translation full-length messenger RNA sequences encoding two oppositely charged trypsinogen isoenzymes in the dog pancreas", MOL. CELL. BIOL.,, (1985), vol. 5, no. 10, pages 2669 - 2676, XP002924316 | [A] - ODETTE GUY-CROTTE ET AL., "Monoclonal Antibodies to human pancreatic trypsin 1 inhibit the activation of human trypsinogens 1 and 2", EUR. J. BIOCHEM.,, (1992), vol. 204, pages 133 - 136, XP002924317 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1992.tb16615.x |