Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101294

EP1101294 - GATED TRANSMISSION IN CONTROL HOLD STATE IN CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2011
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong
Paldal-ku
Suwon-shi
Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2010/50]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-shi
Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-ku
Suwon-shi, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Su-Won
1662-9 Shillim 8-dong, Kwanak-gu
Seoul 151-018 / KR
02 / KIM, Young-Ky
Sunkyong Apt. 12-1401 Daechi-dong, Kangnam-gu
Seoul 135-280 / KR
03 / AHN, Jae-Min C/O SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
P.O. Box 32
463-050 Pundang / KR
04 / KIM, Jae-Yeol
Paekdoo Apt.960-1401 Sanpon 9-danji, Sanpon 2-dong
Kunpo-shi, Kyonggi-do 435-042 / KR
05 / KANG, Hee-Won c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD
P.O. BOX 32
463-050 Pundang / KR
 [2001/26]
Former [2001/21]01 / PARK, Su-Won
1662-9 Shillim 8-dong, Kwanak-gu
Seoul 151-018 / KR
02 / KIM, Young-Ky
Sunkyong Apt. 12-1401 Daechi-dong, Kangnam-gu
Seoul 135-280 / KR
03 / AHN, Jae-Min
Puleun Samho Apt. 109-303, Irwonpon-dong
Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-239 / KR
04 / KIM, Jae-Yeol
Paekdoo Apt.960-1401 Sanpon 9-danji, Sanpon 2-dong
Kunpo-shi, Kyonggi-do 435-042 / KR
05 / KANG, Hee-Won
1499 Myonmok 7-dong, Chungnang-gu
Seoul 131-207 / KR
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99935142.228.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999KR00411
Priority number, dateKR1998003044228.07.1998         Original published format: KR 9830442
KR1998003414622.08.1998         Original published format: KR 9834146
KR1998003668103.09.1998         Original published format: KR 9836681
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0007377
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101294
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101294
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT04.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005, H04J13/02
[2010/20]
Former International [2001/21]H04B7/005, H04J13/02, H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GESCHALTETE ÜBERTRAGUNG IM STEUERHALTESTATUS IN EINEM CDMA KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2001/21]
English:GATED TRANSMISSION IN CONTROL HOLD STATE IN CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2001/21]
French:TRANSMISSION INTERMITTENTE EN ETAT DE MAINTIEN DE LA VOIE DE COMMANDE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AMDC[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2001National basic fee paid 
26.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
26.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
31.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2010Fee for grant paid
29.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
30.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
29.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.12.2010
GR16.03.2011
LU28.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
[2013/25]
Former [2012/11]CY15.12.2010
GR16.03.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2011/36]CY15.12.2010
GR16.03.2011
Former [2011/30]CY15.12.2010
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9702665  (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]);
 [Y]EP0827296  (NEC CORP [JP]);
 [A]JPH1094053  (FUJITSU LTD)