Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095572

EP1095572 - USE OF AN IODINE-CONTAINING COMPOUND FOR PRODUCING AN IODINATED FOOD PRODUCT TO PREVENT CONDITIONS CAUSED BY MALFUNCTIONS OF THE THYROID GLAND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/18]METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN IODINATED FOOD PRODUCT
[2008/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2010
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2010  [2010/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Andreichuk, Vasily Petrovich
Pos. VNIIFBIP, 4-26, Kaluzhskaya obl.
Borovsk, 249010 / RU
[2009/25]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Andreichuk, Vasily Petrovich
Pos. VNIIFBIP, 4-26, Kaluzhskaya obl.
Borovsk, 249010 / RU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Andrews, Timothy Stephen
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Andrews, Timothy Stephen
Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99935206.515.07.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999RU00235
Priority number, dateRU1998011376416.07.1998         Original published format: RU 98113764
[2001/18]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003610
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095572
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1095572
Date:17.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU27.01.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/305, A23J3/00, A23J3/10, A23J3/12, A23J3/08, A23J3/14, A23L1/304, A61K31/4172
[2004/52]
Former International [2001/18]A23L1/305, A23J3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINER JODHALTIHEN VERBINDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES IODIERTEN LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTES ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN DER SCHILDDRÜSENFUNKTION[2008/42]
English:USE OF AN IODINE-CONTAINING COMPOUND FOR PRODUCING AN IODINATED FOOD PRODUCT TO PREVENT CONDITIONS CAUSED BY MALFUNCTIONS OF THE THYROID GLAND[2008/42]
French:UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DE L'IODE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE IODÉ POUR PRÉVENIR LES DYSFONCTIONNEMENTS DE LA GLANDE THYROÏDIENNE[2008/42]
Former [2001/18]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES IODIERTEN LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTES
Former [2001/18]METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN IODINATED FOOD PRODUCT
Former [2001/18]PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE IODE
Entry into regional phase15.02.2001Translation filed 
14.02.2001National basic fee paid 
14.02.2001Search fee paid 
14.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU
14.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
31.07.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2009Fee for grant paid
19.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)18.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
26.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2001
31.07.200608   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US5484623  (MCLEAN LINSEY [US]) [X] 1-18 * column 6, lines 5-22; claims 1-23 *;
 [X]JPH06166889  ;
 [X]SU1746961  ;
 [A]DD296083  (CHARITE MED FAKULTAET [DE]) [A] 11-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3705142  (TURNER CHARLES W) [A] 18 * example I; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0394904  (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 28, Database accession no. 1994-230799, XP002303364 & JPH06166889 A 19940614 (OGURA N) [X] 1-18 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 26, Database accession no. 1993-212736, XP002303365 & SU1746961 A1 19920715 (DAVYDOV A N) [X] 1-18 * abstract *
 [A]  - SUN W ET AL, "Kinetics and mechanism of the peroxidase-catalyzed iodination of tyrosine.", BIOCHEMISTRY. 9 FEB 1993, (19930209), vol. 32, no. 5, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 1324 - 1331, XP002303363 [A] 11-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00056a018
 [A]  - HOFFMANN W ET AL, "THE USE OF IODIZED BRINE FOR IODINE ENRICHMENT OF SEMI-HARD CHEESE", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, VV GMBH VOLKSWIRTSCHAFTLICHER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (1997), vol. 52, no. 5, ISSN 0026-3788, pages 257 - 259, XP000658165 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DELANGE F, "Risks and benefits of iodine supplementation", LANCET, XX, XX, (19980308), vol. 351, no. 9107, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 923 - 924, XP004266929 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(00)80003-3
International search[A]RU2097990  (MO G AKADEMIYA PRIKLADNOJ BIOT [RU]);
 [A]FR2641164  (CAMPO ROSE MARIE [FR]);
 [A]SU210789  ;
 [A]FR2672471  (BONGRAIN SA [FR]);
 [A]GB1303374  ;
 [A]EP0148600  (RALSTON PURINA CO [US])