Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1092325

EP1092325 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT RELATING TO INTELLIGENT NETWORK SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / LARSSON, Martin
Mor Märtas Väg 3 D
S-653 46 Karlstad / SE
 [2001/16]
Representative(s)Westman, Per Börje Ingemar , et al
Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Westman, P. Börje I. , et al
Göteborgs Patentbyra AB Sjöporten 4
417 64 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date99935221.429.06.1999
[2001/16]
WO1999SE01182
Priority number, dateSE1998000233129.06.1998         Original published format: SE 9802331
[2001/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001169
Date:06.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1092325
Date:18.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000
[2001/16]
Search report(s)International search reportSE06.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00, H04M11/00
[2001/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG BETREFFEND DIENSTE EINES INTELLIGENTEN NETZES[2001/16]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT RELATING TO INTELLIGENT NETWORK SERVICES[2001/16]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SE RAPPORTANT A DES SERVICES DE RESEAU INTELLIGENT[2001/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2001National basic fee paid 
10.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
10.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
01.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/28]
04.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]SE9604364  ;
 [A]GB2230163  (MACKENZIE ALASTAIR NEIL);
 [A]GB2292652  (WARD PETER WILLIAM [GB]);
 [A]WO9313507  (HONEYWELL INC [US])