Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100576

EP1100576 - SYNERGISM OF PHOTODYNAMIC AND ELECTROPERMEATION EFFECTS ON CELL VITALITY AS A NOVEL CYTOTOXIC AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genetronics, Inc.
11199-A Sorrento Valley Road
San Diego, CA 92121-1334 / US
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / LAMBREVA, Maya
Dianabad, BL. 39-40, Vh. 12, AP. 194
1172 Sofia / BG
02 / BERG, Hermann
Greifenberg Strasse 15
D-07749 Jena / DE
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/21]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99935345.125.06.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US14202
Priority number, dateUS19980090751P26.06.1998         Original published format: US 90751 P
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0000250
Date:06.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100576
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100576
Date:15.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.01.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K41/00
[2001/28]
Former International [2001/21]A61N1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
TitleGerman:SYNERGISMUS VON PHOTODYNAMISCHEN UND ELEKTROPERMEATIONSEFFEKTEN AUF DIE ZELLVITALITÄT ALS EIN NEUES CYTOTOXISCHES MITTEL[2007/30]
English:SYNERGISM OF PHOTODYNAMIC AND ELECTROPERMEATION EFFECTS ON CELL VITALITY AS A NOVEL CYTOTOXIC AGENT[2001/21]
French:SYNERGISM (DES EFFECTS) DE LA PHOTODYNAMIQUE ET DE L'ELECTROPERMEATION SUR LA VITALITÉ CELLULAIRE COMME NOUVEL AGENT CYTOTOXIQUE[2007/30]
Former [2001/21]ZYTOTOXISCHE SYNERGIE VON PHOTODYNAMISCHEN UND ELEKTROPERMEATIONSEFFEKTEN AUF DIE ZELLVITALITÄT
Former [2001/21]SYNERGIE CYTOTOXIQUE DE LA PHOTODYNAMIQUE ET DE L'ELECTROPERMEATION SUR LA VITALITE CELLULAIRE
Entry into regional phase25.01.2001National basic fee paid 
25.01.2001Search fee paid 
25.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
14.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2007Fee for grant paid
10.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30]
Request for further processing for:28.02.2006Request for further processing filed
28.02.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.03.2006Decision despatched
07.04.2005Request for further processing filed
07.04.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.04.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
PT15.01.2008
[2010/06]
Former [2008/26]FI15.08.2007
PT15.01.2008
Former [2008/18]FI15.08.2007
Documents cited:Search[XAY]  FLYNN G ET AL, "METHOTREXATE-LOADED, PHOTOSENSITIZED ERYTHROCYTES: A PHOTO- ACTIVATABLE CARRIER/DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR USE IN CANCER THERAPY", CANCER LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19940729), vol. 82, no. 2, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 225 - 229, XP000857164 [X] 2,3,13-15,17,20-23,25,26,28-34 * page 226 - page 227 * * abstract * [A] 7-12,18,19,40-42,44,45 [Y] 4-6,16,24,35-39,43,45

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3835(94)90016-7
 [Y]  WARD T ET AL, "Electric field-enhanced activation of hematoporphyrin derivative: effects on a human tumour cell line", CANCER LETTERS, (1997), vol. 113, pages 145 - 151, XP002236794 [Y] 4,5,24 * page 147 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(96)04592-2
 [Y]  GILBERT R A ET AL, "Novel electrode designs for electrochemotherapy", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1997), vol. 1334, pages 9 - 14, XP002236795 [Y] 6,35-39,43,45 * abstract * * page 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(96)00119-5
 [Y]  WARD T ET AL, "THE EFFECTS OF ELECTRIC FIELDS ON PHOTOSENSITIZED ERYTHROCYTES: POSSIBLE ENHANCEMENT OF PHOTODYNAMIC ACTIVATION", CANCER LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960823), vol. 106, no. 1, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 69 - 74, XP000857165 [Y] 16 * page 70, column 2, line 24; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3835(96)04302-9
 [A]  FLYNN G ET AL, "ENCAPSULATION OF THE THROMBOLYTIC ENZYME, BRINASE, IN PHOTOSENSITIZED ERYTHROCYTES: A NOVEL THROMBOLYTIC SYSTEM BASED ON PHOTODYNAMIC ACTIVATION", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY B: BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE S.A., BASEL, CH, (199411), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 1011-1344, pages 193 - 196, XP000857148 [A] 2-26,28-45 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1011-1344(94)07037-7
 [A]  MIKLAVCIC D ET AL, "The importance of electric field distribution for effective in vivo electroporation of tissues", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, (199805), vol. 74, pages 2152 - 2158, XP002236796 [A] 2-26,28-45 * the whole document *
International search[XP]US5786454  (WAKSMAN GABRIEL [US], et al)