Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1104493 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 826
26.07.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
26.07.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
23.07.2012 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
11.07.2012 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
11.07.2012 French translation of claims Opposition 3
11.07.2012 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
11.04.2012 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
11.04.2012 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
11.04.2012 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
28.03.2012 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
15.12.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.12.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.12.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 2
15.12.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.12.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2011 Amended description with annotations Opposition 4
11.02.2011 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
11.10.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Appeal 1
11.10.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
11.10.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.09.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.09.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
09.09.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.09.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 27
22.07.2010 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
15.07.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
06.07.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.07.2010 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 9
30.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.06.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.06.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
31.05.2010 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
26.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.05.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.05.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.05.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 2
10.05.2010 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
28.04.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 9
28.04.2010 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
26.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.03.2010 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
17.03.2010 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
11.03.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.03.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.03.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
19.11.2009 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 2
16.11.2009 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
07.05.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
15.01.2009 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.12.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
29.11.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.11.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.11.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
28.11.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.11.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.10.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.09.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.07.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.07.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
05.07.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.07.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 4
18.09.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
08.05.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
25.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
25.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
25.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
25.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
25.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
25.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
25.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
25.04.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
23.04.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
20.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
20.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.04.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.04.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
26.01.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
22.01.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.01.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
21.12.2006 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
21.12.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 13
21.12.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.12.2006 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
20.10.2006 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.08.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 4
17.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
15.03.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.03.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
08.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
01.10.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
15.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.12.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
21.08.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.08.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.07.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.07.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
15.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
15.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
15.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
15.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.09.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.05.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.01.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
21.01.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.12.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.12.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.12.2001 Preparation of grant Search / examination 2
10.12.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
08.10.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
08.10.2001 Description Search / examination 7
08.10.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.06.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.06.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.05.2001 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 1
10.05.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
25.04.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.04.2001 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.04.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.04.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.02.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.02.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.02.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
11.01.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.10.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
05.10.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
05.10.2000 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
05.10.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.10.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
05.10.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.10.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.10.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.02.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.02.2000 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.02.2000 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.02.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
27.01.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.01.2000 Priority document Search / examination 40
20.01.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 34
11.08.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
11.08.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 4
11.08.1999 Description International Searching Authority 28