Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1093629

EP1093629 - METHOD FOR REMOVING SEISMIC NOISE CAUSED BY EXTERNAL ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.07.2006  [2006/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
5959 Las Colinas Boulevard
Irving, TX 75039-2298 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
5959 Las Colinas Boulevard
Irving, TX 75039-2298 / US
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, VI 22037-0001 / US
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, Virginia 22037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOUCK, Richard, Thomas
2518 Fallview
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
02 / JENKERSON, Michael, Richard
1102 N. Graves
McKinney, TX 75069 / US
03 / SEYB, Stefan, Michael
10947 Cromwell Drive
Dallas, TX 75229 / US
 [2001/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99935418.606.07.1999
[2001/17]
WO1999US15188
Priority number, dateUS1998011057506.07.1998         Original published format: US 110575
[2001/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0002155
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1093629
Date:25.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/17]
Search report(s)International search reportUS13.01.2000
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01V1/36
[2001/39]
Former International [2001/17]G06F19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON SEISMISCHEN GERÄUSCHEN VERURSACHT DURCH EXTERNE AKTIVITÄTEN[2001/17]
English:METHOD FOR REMOVING SEISMIC NOISE CAUSED BY EXTERNAL ACTIVITY[2001/17]
French:PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DU BRUIT SISMIQUE CAUSE PAR UNE ACTIVITE EXTERNE[2001/17]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2001National basic fee paid 
03.01.2001Search fee paid 
03.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/17]
01.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/30]
13.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4314347  (STOKELY JOHN E) [X] 16-18 * column 1, line 30 - line 50 * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 26 * * column 4, line 50 - line 55 * * column 7, line 16 - line 32 * [A] 1,2,5,11,19;
 [A]WO9819182  (PGS TENSOR INC [US]) [A] 1-11,16-22 * page 1, line 16 - page 2, line 7 * * page 6, line 5 - line 11 * * page 8, line 14 - line 21 * * page 9, line 11 - line 14 * * page 12, line 9 - line 32 *;
 [A]US4937794  (MARSCHALL RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11,16-19 * column 1, line 10 - line 13 * * column 1, line 42 - line 54 * * column 2, line 20 - line 38 * * column 6, line 25 - line 51 * * figure 2 *
International search[X]US4937794  (MARSCHALL RICHARD A [US], et al);
 [XP]US5818795  (HAWKINS KEITH [GB], et al)