Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094983

EP1094983 - CAPPING HEAD WITH TORQUE ADJUSTMENT USING MAGNETS SEPARATED BY AN ADJUSTABLE AIR GAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcoa Inc.
Alcoa Corporate Center
201 Isabella Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Alcoa Inc.
Alcoa Corporate Center, 201 Isabella Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SPETHER, Karl, Heinz
Stahlvuhlring No. 2
D-68526 Ladenburg / DE
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date99935445.908.07.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999US15389
Priority number, dateUS19980092132P09.07.1998         Original published format: US 92132 P
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0002810
Date:20.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1094983
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1094983
Date:22.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B67B3/20
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2003/04]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERSCHLIESSKOPF MIT DREHMOMENTEINSTELLUNG DURCH VERSTELLEN DES ABSTANDS ZWISCHEN MAGNETKRÄNZEN[2001/18]
English:CAPPING HEAD WITH TORQUE ADJUSTMENT USING MAGNETS SEPARATED BY AN ADJUSTABLE AIR GAP[2001/18]
French:Tête de vissage de capuchons avec ajustage du couple par réglage de la distance séparant des aimants[2002/13]
Former [2001/18]ENSEMBLE TETES DE VISSAGE DE BOUCHONS MUNIES D'UN AJUSTEMENT DE COUPLE UTILISANT DES AIMANTS SEPARES PAR UN ECART ANTI-RETOUR REGLABLE
Entry into regional phase05.02.2001National basic fee paid 
05.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
26.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2002Fee for grant paid
19.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US4599846  (ELLIS DARWIN L [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12,15,16 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 12; figure 1 *;
 [DX]US5490369  (ELLIS DARWIN L [US], et al) [DX] 1,15 * figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]WO8602917  (WIEDMER ERNST)
by applicantUS5490369
 US4364218
 US4492068
 US4674264
 US5197258