EP1097161 - TETHERED MONOCYCLOPENTADIENYL POLYMERIZATION CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | ||
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANICH, Jo Ann, M. 15710 Mesa Verde Drive Houston, TX 77059 / US | [2001/22] |
Former [2001/19] | 01 /
CANICH, JoAnn, M. Apt. 808 900 Henderson Avenue Houston, TX 77058 / US | Representative(s) | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1830 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 99935463.2 | 08.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999US15493 | Priority number, date | US19980092419P | 10.07.1998 Original published format: US 92419 P | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002891 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097161 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00, C08F4/64, C08F10/00 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/04 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/03 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/03 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | GEBUNDENE MONOCYCLOPENTADIENYL- POLYMERISATIONSKATALYSATOREN | [2001/19] | English: | TETHERED MONOCYCLOPENTADIENYL POLYMERIZATION CATALYSTS | [2001/19] | French: | CATALYSEURS DE POLYMERISATION MONOCYCLOPENTADIENYLE ANCRES | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/44] | 08.06.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9914222 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [PX] 1,2,5-11,13-15 * claims 1,3,4,9 * * page 8, line 17 - line 19 * * page 9, line 1 - line 2 * * page 14, line 5 - line 20 * * page 19, line 12 - line 18 *; | [PX]US5892079 (WILSON JR ROBERT B [US]) [PX] 1,5,15 * claims 60-62 * * column 17, line 39 - column 19, line 42 *; | [PX]WO9920665 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [PX] 1,5,15 * page 15, line 11 - page 16, line 15 * * page 17, line 2 * * page 20, column 1, line 3 * * claims 1,20 * |