Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098614

EP1098614 - FLUID TRANSFER AND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM FOR TREATING THE INNER EAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.11.2008
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Durect Corporation
10240 Bubb Road
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2001/20]
Inventor(s)01 / ARENBERG, Irving, K.
5860 Goldsmith Place
Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US
02 / ARENBERG, Michael, H.
107 Birch Wood Court
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Ostertag, Ulrich , et al
Ostertag & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Epplestrasse 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Ostertag, Ulrich, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2001/20]Harrison, David Christopher , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99935496.212.07.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999US15683
Priority number, dateUS1998012146023.07.1998         Original published format: US 121460
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0004854
Date:03.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098614
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1098614
Date:02.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.02.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61F11/00, A61M29/00, A61M31/00, A61N1/00, A61N1/30
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEITSÜBERTRAGUNG UND DIAGNOSESYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES INNENOHRS[2001/20]
English:FLUID TRANSFER AND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM FOR TREATING THE INNER EAR[2001/20]
French:SYSTEME DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE TRANSFERT DE FLUIDE PERMETTANT DE TRAITER L'OREILLE INTERNE[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2001National basic fee paid 
22.02.2001Search fee paid 
22.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
05.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2007Fee for grant paid
12.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY02.01.2008
DK02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IT02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
SE02.04.2008
GR03.04.2008
ES13.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/06]CY02.01.2008
DK02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IT02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
SE02.04.2008
ES13.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/46]DK02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
SE02.04.2008
ES13.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/42]FI02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
ES13.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/39]FI02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
ES13.04.2008
Former [2008/35]NL02.01.2008
ES13.04.2008
Former [2008/27]NL02.01.2008
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US4244377  (GRAMS GUENTER A);
 [Y]US5368037  (EBERLE MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [Y]US5476446  (ARENBERG IRVING K [US])