Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097224

EP1097224 - GENES ENCODING SULFATE ASSIMILATION PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2008
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington DE 19898 / US
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FALCO, Saverio, Carl
1902 Millers Road
Arden, DE 19810 / US
02 / ALLEN, Stephen, M.
2225 Rosewood Drive
Wilmington, DE 19810 / US
03 / MAXWELL, Carl, A.
35 Mary Anita Court
Ekton, MD 21921 / US
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Webber, Philip Michael
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Webber, Philip Michael
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99935542.313.07.1999
[2001/19]
WO1999US15872
Priority number, dateUS19980092833P14.07.1998         Original published format: US 92833 P
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0004167
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1097224
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/54, C12N15/82, C12N9/10, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GENE, DIE FÜR SULFATASSIMILATIONSPROTEINE KODIEREN[2001/19]
English:GENES ENCODING SULFATE ASSIMILATION PROTEINS[2001/19]
French:GENES CODANT DES PROTEINES D'ASSIMILATION DU SULFATE[2001/19]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2000National basic fee paid 
11.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/19]
27.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/22]
11.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[X]  - SAITO K. ET AL., "Molecular cloning and characterization of a plant serine acetyltransferase playing a regulatory role in cysteine biosynthesis from watermelon", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 270, no. 27, pages 16321 - 16326, XP002115631 [X] 6,10,11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.27.16321
 [X]  - ROBERTS M. ET AL., "Cloning and characterization of an Arabidopsis thaliana cDNA clone encoding an organellar isoform of serine acetyltransferase", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 30, pages 1041 - 1049, XP002115633 [X] 10,11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00020814
 [X]  - SASAKI T., "AC C26373", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19970806), XP002128627 [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SAITO K. AND TAKAGI Y., "AC P93544", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19970501), XP002128628 [X] 6,10,11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - YOO B. AND HARMON A., "Regulation of recombinant soybean serine acetyltransferase by CDPK", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY SUPPL., (1997), vol. 114, page 267, XP002128629 [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - SAITO K. ET AL., "Molecular characterization of cysteine biosynthetic enzymes in plants", COMPTES RENDUS DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES, vol. 319, pages 969 - 973, XP002121795 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SAITO ET AL, "Modulation of cysteine biosynthesis in chloroplasts of transgenic tobacco overexpressing cysteine synthase (O-Acetylserine(thiol) -lyase)", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (19940101), no. 106, ISSN 0032-0889, page 887 895, XP002078205 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.106.3.887
 [A]  - SAITO K., "Molecular aspects of sulfur assimilation and acclimation to sulfur supply in plants", STRESS RESPONSES OF PHOTOSYNTHETIC ORGANISMS, (1998), pages 215 - 226, XP002121796 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - YAMAMOTO K AND SASAKI T., "AC AU068082", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19990607), XP002128630 [PX] 1,2,4-6,10,11 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - YU Y. ET AL., "AC AQ688702", EMBL DATABASE, Heidelberg, (19990702), XP002128631 [PX] 1,2,4-6,10,11 * the whole document *