Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019977

EP1019977 - HIGH UNIFORMITY MICROSTRIP TO MODIFIED-SQUARE-AX INTERCONNECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.12.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.02.2004  [2004/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
2000 E. El Segundo Boulevard
P.O. Box 902
El Segundo
California 90245-0902 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
2000 E. El Segundo Boulevard, P.O. Box 902
El Segundo, California 90245-0902 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COX, Gerald, A.
8163 Redlands 1
Playa Del Rey, CA 90293 / US
02 / MCWHIRTER, Brian, T.
2105 Harriman Lane 3
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
03 / WONG, Joseph, S.
1664 Glenwood Avenue
Upland, CA 91786 / US
04 / YACCARINO, Robert, G., c/o Raytheon Company
P.O. Box 902 (R2/V518)
El Segundo, CA 90245-0902 / US
05 / BRADSHAW, Steve, E.
23708 Elkwood Street
West Hills, CA 91304 / US
06 / HOLBROOK, Peter, J.
7507 Manchester Avenue 725
Westchester, CA 90045 / US
[2000/43]
Former [2000/29]01 / COX, Gerald, A.
8163 Redlands 1
Playa Del Rey, CA 90293 / US
02 / MCWHIRTER, Brian, T.
2105 Harriman Lane 3
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
03 / WONG, Joseph, S.
1664 Glenwood Avenue
Upland, CA 91786 / US
04 / YACCARINO, Robert, G.
2204 Huntington Lane 2
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
05 / BRADSHAW, Steve, E.
23708 Elkwood Street
West Hills, CA 91304 / US
06 / HOLBROOK, Peter, J.
7507 Manchester Avenue 725
Westchester, CA 90045 / US
Representative(s)Steil, Christian , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner, Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99935543.113.07.1999
[2000/29]
WO1999US15873
Priority number, dateUS1998012686931.07.1998         Original published format: US 126869
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0007259
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019977
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01P5/08
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB [2000/29]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNG MIT HOHER UNIFORMITÄT ZWISCHEN MIKROSTREIFENLEITER UND MODIFIZIERTER KOAXIALLEITUNG MIT VIERECKIGEM QUERSCHNITT[2000/29]
English:HIGH UNIFORMITY MICROSTRIP TO MODIFIED-SQUARE-AX INTERCONNECT[2000/29]
French:INTERCONNEXION TRES UNIFORME ENTRE UNE LIGNE A MICRORUBAN ET UNE LIGNE QUADRI-AXE MODIFIEE[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2000National basic fee paid 
11.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
23.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS5586204  ;
 [Y]US5508666  (NGUYEN DUNG T [US]) [Y] 1,4-7,10,13-15 * column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]JPS63316901  ;
 [A]US4611186  (ZIEGNER BERNHARD A [US]) [A] 2,11 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 38 - line 46; figures 2,5 *;
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800918), vol. 4, no. 133, Database accession no. (E - 026), [Y] 1,3,5-7,10,12,14,15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890419), vol. 13, no. 164, Database accession no. (E - 745), [Y] 1,3-7,10,12-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - E.H. ENGLAND, "A COAXIAL TO MICROSTRIP TRANSITION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES., IEEE INC. NEW YORK., US, (197601), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 47 - 48, XP002118171 [A] 2,11 * page 47, line 15 - line 29; figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.1976.1128765
 [A]  - WANG H ET AL, "THE HIGHER ORDER MODAL CHARACTERISTICS OF CIRCULAR-RECTANGULAR COAXIAL WAVEGUIDES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (19970301), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 414 - 419, XP000683584 [A] 8 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.563341
 [A]  - W. OLDFIELD, "DEVELOPMENT OF BROADBAND COAXIAL COMPONENTS FOR A 0.01 TO 40 GHZ MEASUREMENT SYSTEM", 1983 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM-DIGEST, BOSTON (US), (19830531), pages 375 - 377, XP002118172 [A] 9,16 * page 375, column R, line 30 - line 39; figure 3 *