blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1100476

EP1100476 - FORMULATIONS FOR THE TRANSDERMAL ADMINISTRATION OF FENOLDOPAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALZA Corporation
1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210
Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
ALZA Corporation
1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210
Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
ALZA CORPORATION
950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950
Palo Alto California 94303-0802 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VAN OSDOL, William, W.
1662 Cornell Drive
Mountian View, CA 94040 / US
02 / CRISOLOGO, Nieves, M.
787 Madrone Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94086-3042 / US
03 / YUM, Su, Il
1021 Runnymead Court
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London W1W 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [2001/21]Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Application number, filing date99935613.216.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US16083
Priority number, dateUS19980094059P24.07.1998         Original published format: US 94059 P
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0004886
Date:03.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100476
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100476
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/70, A61K31/55, A61P9/12
[2001/21]
CPC:
A61K9/7084 (EP); A61K31/55 (EP); A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP); A61P9/04 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K47/12 (EP); A61K47/14 (EP); A61K47/18 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR TRANSDERMALEN VERABREICHUNG VON FENOLDOPAM[2001/21]
English:FORMULATIONS FOR THE TRANSDERMAL ADMINISTRATION OF FENOLDOPAM[2001/21]
French:FORMULATIONS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMIQUE DE FENOLDOPAM[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2001National basic fee paid 
24.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
30.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2004Fee for grant paid
14.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH16.06.2004
CY16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
LU16.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
[2007/23]
Former [2005/22]CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
Former [2004/51]CH16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[DA]US4197297  (WEINSTOCK JOSEPH [US]) [DA] 1-3,5,19 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 56 ** column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 18; examples 8,9; claim - *;
 [X]WO9116041  (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB [GB]) [X] 1,10 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 12 * * page 4, line 1 - line 13 * * page 5, line 15 - line 19 * * page 5, line 21 - line 30 * * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 20; example 1; claims 1,6,9 *
ExaminationUS5656286
 US5719197
 WO9915210
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.