EP1105990 - METHOD AND APPARATUS IN A MESSAGING SYSTEM FOR LIMITING AN ACCUMULATION OF MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2001/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPS, W., Garland 2506 Winding Hollow Lane Arlington, TX 76006 / US | 02 /
WESLEY, Eric, Jon, Robert 8F, No. 5, Tung-An Street Taipei / TW | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Litchfield, Laura Marie, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Litchfield, Laura Marie, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint - Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99935642.1 | 16.07.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999US16156 | Priority number, date | US19980135627 | 18.08.1998 Original published format: US 135627 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0011821 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1105990 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16, H04J3/22, H04Q7/10 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
H04W88/185 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/24] | H04J3/16, H04J3/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN EINEM MITTEILUNGSSYSTEM ZUR BEGRENZUNG VON ANHÄUFUNG VON MITTEILUNGEN | [2001/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS IN A MESSAGING SYSTEM FOR LIMITING AN ACCUMULATION OF MESSAGES | [2001/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DANS UN SYSTEME DE MESSAGERIE DESTINE A LIMITER UNE ACCUMULATION DE MESSAGES | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 10.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | 25.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0936825 (ALCATEL USA SOURCING LP) [E] 1,4-6,9,10 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 46 * * column 10, line 38 - column 12, line 6 *; | [Y]WO9639783 (MOTOROLA INC) [Y] 1,4-6,9,10 * page 3, line 6 - line 16 * * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 31 * * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 22 *; | [Y]EP0714216 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1,4-6,9,10 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 57 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 30 * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 38 *; | [A]US4866707 (PROUDLER GRAEME J ET AL) [A] 1,5,6,10 * column 1, line 21 - line 53 * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 62 * * column 16, line 49 - column 17, line 30 * * column 20, line 20 - line 36 *; | [PA]WO9927726 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC) [PA] 1,5,6,10 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 18; figure 5 * | International search | [Y]US4866707 ; | [Y]US5327426 ; | [Y]US5649289 ; | [YP]US5896372 |