Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100524

EP1100524 - USE OF RECOMBINANT HUMAN UTEROGLOBIN IN TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY AND FIBROTIC CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 16.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Calregen Inc.
335 Paint Branch Road
College Park, MD 20742 / US
For all designated states
NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325
Rockville, MD 20852 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Claragen, Inc.
335 Paint Branch Road, College Park
MD 20742 / US
For all designated states
NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325
Rockville, MD 20852 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PILON, Aprile
11333 Rambling Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20879 / US
02 / MUKHERJEE, Anil, B.
P.O. Box 136
Brookeville, MD 20833 / US
03 / ZHANG, Zhongjian
10 Chantilly Road
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Ritter, Stephen David , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Ritter, Stephen David , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date99935698.319.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US16312
Priority number, dateUS1998012026421.07.1998         Original published format: US 120264
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0004863
Date:03.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1100524
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.11.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, C07K14/46, C07K17/00, G01N33/53, A61P35/00
[2003/21]
Former International [2001/21]A61K38/17, C07K14/46, C07K17/00, G01N33/53
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON REKOMBINANTEM HUMANEN UTEROGLOBIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN UND FIBROTISCHEN KRANKHEITSZUSTÄNDEN[2001/21]
English:USE OF RECOMBINANT HUMAN UTEROGLOBIN IN TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY AND FIBROTIC CONDITIONS[2001/21]
French:UTILISATION D'UTEROGLOBINE HUMAINE DE RECOMBINAISON DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'ETATS INFLAMMATOIRES ET DE TYPE FIBREUX[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase30.01.2001National basic fee paid 
30.01.2001Search fee paid 
30.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/09]
deletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
27.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/10]
04.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/10]
24.11.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5696092  (PATIERNO STEVEN R [US], et al) [XD] 1-9,16-21 *cf. abstract, col. 2 bridging with col. 3, lines 1-25, "Summary"*;
 [X]WO9640657  (UNIV GEORGE WASHINGTON [US]) [X] 1-9 *cf. abstract, pp. 7-15, 1st para., page 28, line 9-26*;
 [XY]WO9807857  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-9 *cf. abstract* [Y] 16-21;
 [X]  LEYTON J ET AL, Recombinant human uteroglobin inhibits in the vitro invasiveness of human metastatic prostate tumor cells and the release of arachidonic acid stimulated by fibroblast-conditioned medium, CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, VOL. 54, NR. 14, PAGE(S) 3696-3699, ISSN 0008-5472, XP002145528 [X] 1-9,16-21 *cf. abstract, page 3698. left-sided col, 2nd para. bridging with page 3699, col. on the left side (discussion)*
 [XY]  LEYTON J ET AL, "Recombinant human uteroglobin-like protein (cc10 kDa) inhibits the chemoinvasive activity of DU 145 human prostate tumor cell in vitro: Correlation with inhibition of arachidonic acid release", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1994), vol. 35, ISSN 0197-016X, page 280, XP002145530 [X] 1-9 *cf. abstract* [Y] 16-21
International search[X]US5696092  (PATIERNO STEVEN R [US], et al);
 [Y]  - DIAZ GONZALEZ ET AL., "Binding of uteroglobin to microsomes and plasmatic membranes", FEBS LETTERS,, (1995), vol. 361, pages 255 - 258, XP002931873

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(95)00167-8
 [Y]  - SAMBROOK, ET AL., "DETECTION AND ANALYSIS OF PROTEINS EXPRESSED FROM CLONED GENES", MOLECULAR CLONING. A LABORATORY MANUAL, XX, XX, XX, (19890101), page 18.03/18.04 + 18.06/18.07, XP002931872
 [A]  - DIERYNCK ET AL., "The human Clara cell protein: Biochemical and biological characterization of a natural immunosuppressor", MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS,, (1996), vol. 1, pages 385 - 387, XP002931871