Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098996

EP1098996 - METHOD FOR DETECTING NUCLEIC ACIDS USING TARGET-MEDIATED LIGATION OF BIPARTITE PRIMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yale University
451 College Street
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
YALE UNIVERSITY
451 College Street
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LIZARDI, Paul, M.
350 Mountain Road
Hamden, CT 06514 / US
02 / HUANG, Xiaohua
Apt. A, 597 Prospect Street
New Havven, CT 06511 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Miles, John Stephen
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Miles, John Stephen
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date99935725.420.07.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999US16373
Priority number, dateUS19980093479P20.07.1998         Original published format: US 93479 P
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0004193
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098996
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C07H21/00
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON NUKLEINSÄUREN UNTER VERWENDUNG ZIELGERICHTETER LIGATION VON ZWEITEILIGEN PRIMERN[2001/20]
English:METHOD FOR DETECTING NUCLEIC ACIDS USING TARGET-MEDIATED LIGATION OF BIPARTITE PRIMERS[2001/20]
French:PROCEDE POUR DETECTER DES ACIDES NUCLEIQUES AU MOYEN DE LIGATURE A MEDIATION PAR CIBLES D'AMORCES BIPARTITES[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2001National basic fee paid 
19.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
13.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/38]
01.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO9719193  (UNIV YALE [US]) [DY] 1-31 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9424312  (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-31 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 2; example 1; claims 1-17 *;
 [Y]WO9416108  (NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US]) [Y] 1-31 * figures 7,9; example 1 *;
 [Y]EP0379369  (SYNTEX INC [US]) [Y] 1-31 * claims 8-18 *;
 [A]WO9804746  (SINAI SCHOOL MEDICINE [US]) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5648245  (FIRE ANDREW [US], et al);
 [PX]GB2332516  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [PX] 1-31 * see whole document, especially fig. 1 *