Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099103

EP1099103 - APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING ODER LEVELS IN GAS STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MILTON ROY COMPANY
201 Ivyland Road
Ivyland, PA 18974-0577 / US
[2009/45]
Former [2001/46]For all designated states
YZ Systems, Inc.
3101 Pollock Drive
Conroe, Texas 77303 / US
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Y-Z Industries Sales, Inc.
3101 Pollok
Conroe, TX 77303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARSHALL, Stephen, Edward
715 Orleans Court
Conroe, TX 77302 / US
02 / SELMAN, Glenn, Scott
21418 Slippery Creek Lane
Spring, TX 77388 / US
03 / SKUBIS, Christopher, Lee
120 West High Oaks Circle
The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Leckey, David Herbert , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/29]Leckey, David Herbert , et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2002/42]Leckey, David Herbert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2001/20]Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date99935858.321.07.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999US16634
Priority number, dateUS1998012151223.07.1998         Original published format: US 121512
US1999024456003.02.1999         Original published format: US 244560
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0005563
Date:03.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099103
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099103
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.02.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/00, G01N33/22
[2004/37]
Former International [2001/20]G01N7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER GERUCHSNIVEAUS IN GASSTRÖMEN[2001/20]
English:APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING ODER LEVELS IN GAS STREAMS[2001/20]
French:APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER DES NIVEAUX D'ODEUR DANS DES FLUX GAZEUX[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2001National basic fee paid 
31.01.2001Search fee paid 
31.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
08.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2011Fee for grant paid
25.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2007
Opposition(s)23.04.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.06.2008Request for further processing filed
06.06.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
26.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
24.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
24.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
IE21.07.2011
LU21.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
[2013/46]
Former [2013/25]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
IE21.07.2011
LU21.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/35]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
IE21.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/31]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/23]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/20]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/12]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/11]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/10]BE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/09]BE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/08]NL20.07.2011
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2210297  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 1,14-18 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 23; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5767385  (BUNDY DWAINE S [US], et al) [Y] 1,14-18 * column 3, line 35 - column 8, line 67; figures 1,6,7 *;
 [A]US3882713  (NISHIDA KAZUKO, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  U. LACHENMAYER ET AL, "Untersuchungen zur Neuentwicklung eines Olfaktometer", STAUB-REINHALTUNG DER LUFT, DE, (1984), vol. 44, pages 359 - 362, XP002289210 [A] 1 * page 359, paragraph 2 *
International search[A]US5675070  (GELPERIN ALAN [US])