Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100802

EP1100802 - OXAZOLO, THIAZOLO AND SELENAZOLO [4,5-c]-QUINOLINE-4-AMINES AND ANALOGS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/21]OXAZOLO, THIAZOLO AND SELENAZOLO [4,5-c]-QUINOLIN-4-AMINES AND ANALOGS THEREOF
[2003/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GERSTER, John, F.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / LINDSTROM, Kyle, J.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
03 / MARSZALEK, Gregory, J.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
04 / MERRILL, Bryon, A.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
05 / MICKELSON, John, W.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
06 / RICE, Michael, J.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/21]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99935968.028.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US17027
Priority number, dateUS19980094346P28.07.1998         Original published format: US 94346 P
US1999036154427.07.1999         Original published format: US 361544
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0006577
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100802
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100802
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D498/04, A61K31/44, C07D513/04, C07D517/04, C07D513/14, // (C07D498/04, 263:00), C07D221:00,(C07D513/04, 277:00), C07D221:00,(C07D517/04, 293:00), C07D221:00,(C07D513/14, 277:00, 221:00), C07D221:00
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:OXAZOLO, THIAZOLO UND SELENAZOLO [4,5-C]-CHINOLIN-4-AMINE UND DERIVATE DAVON[2003/33]
English:OXAZOLO, THIAZOLO AND SELENAZOLO [4,5-c]-QUINOLINE-4-AMINES AND ANALOGS THEREOF[2003/33]
French:OXAZOLO, THIAZOLO ET SELENAZOLO [4,5-c]-QUINOLINE-4-AMINES ET LEURS ANALOGUES[2001/21]
Former [2001/21]OXAZOLO, THIAZOLO UND SELENAZO [4,5-C]-CHINOLIN-4-AMINE UND DERIVATE DAVON
Former [2001/21]OXAZOLO, THIAZOLO AND SELENAZOLO [4,5-c]-QUINOLIN-4-AMINES AND ANALOGS THEREOF
Entry into regional phase28.02.2001National basic fee paid 
28.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
06.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
16.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2003Fee for grant paid
05.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03021166.8  / EP1380587
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.09.2003
[2007/23]
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9816514  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1,15-25 * pages 1-3,9,12-19; claims *;
 [A]EP0055248  (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4038396  (SHEN TSUNG-YING, et al) [DA] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9305042  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1,15-25 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9502598  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1,15-25 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9502597  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1,15-25 * the whole document *;
 [PAX]WO9842712  (SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [PA] 1,15 * pages 28,29, paragraph 4.1.4 * [PX] 24
 [A]  - TEMPLE C, JR. ET AL, "Synthesis of imidazo[4,5-b]pyridines and v-triazolo[4,5-b]pyridines. Preparation of 1-deaza-6-thioguanine analogs", J. ORG. CHEM. (JOCEAH);1976; VOL.41 (24); PP.3784-8, South. Res. Inst.;Kettering-Meyer Lab.; Birmingham; Ala., XP002121358 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00886a003
Examination   - KOROLKOVAS A.: 'Essentials of Medicinal Chemistry', 1988, JOHN WILEY & SONS, NEW YORK