Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978193

EP0978193 - METHOD FOR ENTRANCE TELEPHONE COMMUNICATION UTILIZING PUBLIC SUBSCRIBER TELEPHONE NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Anders Trell Trust
Suite 11C, 23 High Street
Buffalo, NY 14203 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / TRELL, Anders, Edvard
Högalidsgatan 27
S-117 30 Stockholm / SE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Norén, Per Bo Arne , et al
SWEDPATENT AB
P.O. Box 186
746 24 Balsta / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Norén, Per Bo Arne , et al
SWEDPATENT AB P.O. Box 186
746 24 Balsta / SE
Application number, filing date99936157.917.02.1999
[2000/06]
WO1999SE00212
Priority number, dateSE1998000057924.02.1998         Original published format: SE 9800579
SE1998000214716.06.1998         Original published format: SE 9802147
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9944353
Date:02.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978193
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04M11/02, H04M15/08
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR TELEFONISCHEN KOMMUNIKATION MIT EINEM EINGANG UNTER VERWENDUNG DES ÖFFENTLICHEN TELEFONNETZES[2000/06]
English:METHOD FOR ENTRANCE TELEPHONE COMMUNICATION UTILIZING PUBLIC SUBSCRIBER TELEPHONE NETWORKS[2000/06]
French:PROCEDE DESTINE A UNE COMMUNICATION TELEPHONIQUE D'ENTREE UTILISANT DES RESEAUX TELEPHONIQUES PUBLICS D'ABONNES[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase13.10.1999National basic fee paid 
13.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
28.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/24]
13.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2665041  (IRIS PASCAL) [A] 1 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 11 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 17 *;
 [A]DE19603095  (LOH KG RITTO WERK [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 36 *;
 [A]US5046083  (TRELL ANDERS E [SE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 24 *