Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102779

EP1102779 - TREATMENT OF BACTERIAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Governors of the University of Alberta
222 Campus Towers, 8625 - 112 Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
THE GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALBERTA
222 Campus Towers, 8625 - 112 Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / BUNDLE, David, R.
18 Marlboro Road
Edmonton, Alberta T6J 2C6 / CA
02 / KITOV, Pavel
405, 10610-83 Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta T6E 2E2 / CA
03 / READ, Randy, J.
27 Hinton Avenue
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 7AR / GB
04 / LING, Hong
309B - 3811-107 Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6J 2N7 / CA
05 / ARMSTRONG, Glen
7951-91 Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta T6C 1P9 / CA
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Senior, Janet , et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]Senior, Janet , et al
Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Former [2001/22]Adams, Nicola , et al
Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date99936219.706.08.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999CA00725
Priority number, dateUS1998013049507.08.1998         Original published format: US 130495
US1999031729024.05.1999         Original published format: US 317290
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0008467
Date:17.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102779
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07H1/00, C07H15/00, A61K31/70, G01N33/53, G01N33/569
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/22]
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG BAKTERIELLER INFEKTIONEN[2001/22]
English:TREATMENT OF BACTERIAL INFECTIONS[2001/22]
French:TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS BACTERIENNES[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase02.03.2001National basic fee paid 
02.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
02.05.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/42]
13.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9748711  (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 4 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]WO9826662  (PENN STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,13,15-18 * page 4, line 6 - line 25 * * page 22, line 4 - page 23, line 21 *;
 [DA]US5679653  (ARMSTRONG GLEN D [CA], et al) [DA] 1,9 * column 2, line 21 - line 29 * * column 3, line 29 - line 46 *;
 [DX]  - H. C. HANSEN ET AL., "Di-, tri-, and tetravalent dendritic galabiosides that inhibit hemagglutination by Steptococcus suis at nanomolar concentration", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, pages 6974 - 6979, XP002132441 [DX] 1,6 * page 6975, column L, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja970859p
 [X]  - ASHTON P R ET AL, A CONVERGENT SYNTHESIS OF A CARBOHYDRATE-CONTAINING DENDRIMER, ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION,DE,VERLAG CHEMIE. WEINHEIM, VOL. 36, NR. 7, PAGE(S) 732-735, ISSN 0570-0833, XP002042913 [X] 1,3,4,6 * Scheme 2; page 734 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.199707321
 [X]  - AOI K ET AL, GLOBULAR CARBOHYDRATE MACROMOLECULE SUGAR BALLS. 1. SYNTHESIS OF NOVEL SUGAR-PERSUBSTITUTED POLY(AMINO AMINE) DENDRIMERS, MACROMOLECULES,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, VOL. 28, PAGE(S) 5391-5393, ISSN 0024-9297, XP002042905 [X] 1,3,4,6 * Scheme 1; page 5391, column R, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00119a037
 [X]  - ZANINI D ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF NEW ALPHA-THIOSIALODENDRIMERS AND THEIR BINDING PROPERTIES TO THE SIALIC ACID SPECIFIC LECTIN FROM LIMAX FLAVUS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, (19970305), vol. 119, no. 9, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2088 - 2095, XP000197859 [X] 1,6 * Chart 1; page 2092 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja963874n
 [A]  - ROY R, GLYCODENDRIMERS: A NEW CLASS OF BIOPOLYMERS, POLYMER NEWS,US,GORDON AND BREACH, NEW YORK, NY, VOL. 21, NR. 7, PAGE(S) 226-232, ISSN 0032-3918, XP002042908 [A] 1,9 * Table 1; page 226, column R, paragraph 2 - page 227, column L, paragraph 2 *
 [AD]  - J. DAHMÉN ET AL., "Synthesis of spacer-arm, lipid, and ethyl glycosides of the trisaccharide portion [alpha-D-Gal-(1-4)-beta-D-Gal-(1-4)-beta-D-Glc] of the blood-group Pk antigen: preparation of neo-glycoproteins", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 127, pages 15 - 25, XP002132442 [AD] 1 * Scheme; page 16 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(84)85102-2