Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1045966

EP1045966 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AND MONITORING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/43]
Inventor(s)01 / LANGER, Winfried
Fliederweg 7
D-71706 Markgroeningen / DE
02 / BEDERNA, Frank
Plugfelder Strasse 21
D-70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE
03 / STREIB, Martin
Hohenzollernstrasse 13
D-71665 Vaihingen / DE
[2000/43]
Application number, filing date99936349.228.05.1999
[2000/43]
WO1999DE01579
Priority number, dateDE199814115109.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19841151
[2000/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0014394
Date:16.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1045966
Date:25.10.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1045966
Date:14.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02D31/00, F02D41/08, F02D41/12, F02D41/16
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN UND ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2000/43]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AND MONITORING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2000/43]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER ET SURVEILLER UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2000/43]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2000National basic fee paid 
18.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
31.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2002Fee for grant paid
03.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DX]DE19536038  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DX] 1-3,8 * column 3, line 5 - line 9 * * column 4, line 44 - line 48 * * column 6, line 23 - line 29 *;
 [X]FR2722248  (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE SA [FR]) [X] 1,8 * page 2, line 8 - line 13 * * page 2, line 31 - line 33 * * claim 2 *;
 [X]DE4223520  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,8 * column 2, line 26 - line 29 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 11 *;
 [A]US4671238  (OHTAKI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 1, line 57 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 6 *;
 [A]FR2657398  (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,8 * column A *