EP1086511 - INSULATION PIERCING CONNECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADLFINGER, Peter Burgstall 19 D-92245 Kümmersbruck / DE | 02 /
BUSCH, Klaus Bonhoefferstrasse 14 D-92224 Amberg / DE | 03 /
GIESELMANN, Michael Gebbertstrasse 81 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
HERRMANN, Johann Oberhaselbach 206 D-84066 Mallersdorf-Pfaffenberg / DE | 05 /
HOFRICHTER, Johann Weidenstrasse 4 D-92546 Schmidgaden / DE | 06 /
SÖRGEL, Norbert Häringloher Strasse 59 D-92284 Poppenricht / DE | 07 /
ZIMMERMANN, Rudolf Hammerphilippsburg 3 D-92237 Sulzbach-Rosenberg / DE | 08 /
HUSTER, Bernd Jean-Paul-Strasse 12 D-95213 Münchberg / DE | 09 /
LINDE, Hansjürgen Hutholzweg 18 D-96450 Coburg / DE | 10 /
NEUMANN, Uwe Kunigundendamm 146 D-96050 Bamberg / DE | [2001/13] | Application number, filing date | 99936361.7 | 31.05.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999DE01593 | Priority number, date | DE1998125627 | 08.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19825627 | [2001/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9965110 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086511 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086511 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
H01R4/2437 (EP);
H01R4/2425 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2001/13] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDKLEMME | [2001/13] | English: | INSULATION PIERCING CONNECTING DEVICE | [2001/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERCE-ISOLANT | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE9302765U (GROTE & HARTMANN) [X] 1,2 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [Y] 10,16; | [Y]US4824395 (BLAHA WILLIAM E [US]) [Y] 10 * column 1, line 18 - line 22 *; | [YA]EP0459144 (KRONE AG [DE]) [Y] 16 * column 3, line 5 - line 33 * * column 4, line 33 - line 51; figures 1-4A; claim 1 * [A] 1,2; | [A]EP0643440 (MOD TAP W CORP [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 14 - line 22; figures 1-3B *; | [A]DE2040805 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 11 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1; figure 6 * |