Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034644

EP1034644 - DATA CARRIER WITH AT LEAST TWO DEMODULATORS FOR RECEIVING ASK SIGNALS OF DIFFERING MODULATION INDEX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.10.2003  [2003/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / AMTMANN, Franz
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Weber, Helmut , et al
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Triester Strasse 64
1101 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Weber, Helmut , et al
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Triester Strasse 64
1101 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date99936485.402.07.1999
[2000/37]
WO1999EP04717
Priority number, dateEP1998089020313.07.1998         Original published format: EP 98890203
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0004686
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034644
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034644
Date:23.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/06, G06K7/00
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/43]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:DATENTRÄGER MIT WENIGSTENS ZWEI DEMODULATOREN ZUM EMPFANG VON ASK-SIGNALE UNTERSCHIEDLICHER MODULATIONSTIEFE[2000/37]
English:DATA CARRIER WITH AT LEAST TWO DEMODULATORS FOR RECEIVING ASK SIGNALS OF DIFFERING MODULATION INDEX[2000/37]
French:VECTEUR DE DONNEES POSSEDANT AU MOINS DEUX DEMODULATEURS DESTINES A RECEVOIR DES SIGNAUX D'APPEL A INDICES DE MODULATION DIFFERENTS --[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2000National basic fee paid 
27.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
29.01.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
28.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
02.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2002Fee for grant paid
05.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US5347542  (KURBY CHRISTOPHER N [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column A *;
 [A]US5577087  (FURUYA YUKITSUNA [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column A *;
 [A]DE19526998  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2308948  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *