EP1100400 - DEVICE FOR INSEMINATING ANIMALS, MAINLY SOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kisfeld, Alfons Gaxel 1 48691 Vreden / DE | [2001/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 99936562.0 | 17.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999EP05112 | Priority number, date | DE1998213921U | 04.08.1998 Original published format: DE 29813921 U | [2001/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007519 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100400 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100400 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61D19/02 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
A61D19/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESAMUNG VON TIEREN, INSBESONDERE SAUEN | [2001/21] | English: | DEVICE FOR INSEMINATING ANIMALS, MAINLY SOWS | [2001/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR INSEMINER DES ANIMAUX, NOTAMMENT DE TRUIES | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.05.2004 | FI | 19.05.2004 | IE | 19.05.2004 | IT | 19.05.2004 | AT | 17.07.2004 | LU | 17.07.2004 | BE | 31.07.2004 | CH | 31.07.2004 | LI | 31.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | GR | 19.08.2004 | SE | 19.08.2004 | PT | 19.10.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
AT | 17.07.2004 | ||
LU | 17.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
AT | 17.07.2004 | ||
LU | 17.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 17.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 17.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 17.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 19.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2701998 (JOVANOV MILE) [A] 1-17 * page 11, paragraph 5 * * figure 9 *; | [DA]DE29505177U (KISFELD ALFONS [DE]) [DA] 1-17 * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 12 * * figure 3 *; | [PA]FR2762506 (GENES DIFFUSION [FR]) [PA] 1,4,6,8 * page 3, lines 22-25 ** figure 1 * | by applicant | DE1766902 | DE29505177U |