Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103169

EP1103169 - PRINTED CIRCUIT CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.05.2002
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 10.07.2002  [2002/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maine Circuits Imprimes
347 avenue Patton
49000 Angers / FR
[2001/22]
Inventor(s)01 / BREMOND, Michel
34, boulevard Gaston Dumesnil
F-49100 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Denis, Hervé
BULL S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle PC: P4/079 rue Jean Jaurès - BP 68
78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Denis, Hervé
BULL S.A. PC 58D20, 68, route de Versailles
78434 Louveciennes Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99936698.205.08.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999FR01943
Priority number, dateFR1998001015106.08.1998         Original published format: FR 9810151
[2001/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0008900
Date:17.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103169
Date:30.05.2001
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/11, H05K3/46
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/22]
TitleGerman:GEDRUCKTE SCHALTUNGSPLATTE[2001/22]
English:PRINTED CIRCUIT CARD[2001/22]
French:CARTE DE CIRCUITS IMPRIMES[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2001National basic fee paid 
06.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
22.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
08.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/28]
18.02.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0814643  (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5784262  (SHERMAN JOHN V [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]  - W. BUDWEISER, "Améliorer la densité de câblage des cartes équipées de BGA", ELECTRONIQUE., PARIS FR, (199603), no. 57, pages 73 - 78, XP000580041 [A] 1-3 * page 76, column R, paragraph L - page 78; figures 4-6 *
 [A]  - A. GOBERECHT, "Blind and buried vias for multilayer PCBs", ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND APPLICATIONS., EINDHOVEN NL, (1988), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 211 - 214, XP000035759 [A] * the whole document *