Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021317

EP1021317 - AIR-BAGGED SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NHK SPRING CO., LTD.
10, Fukuura 3-chome, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
NHK SPRING CO.LTD.
10 Fukuura 3-chome, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MURATA, Yoshiaki
2-17-1, Asahi, Oizumimachi
Ora-gun, Gumma 370-0514 / JP
02 / TAKAZAWA, Syunji
516-2, Takahayashinishimachi
Ota -shi, Gumma 373-0828 / JP
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99937044.812.08.1999
[2000/30]
WO1999JP04370
Priority number, dateJP1998022818812.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22818898
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0009365
Date:24.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021317
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000
[2000/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/20
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2000/30]
TitleGerman:SITZ MIT EINEM AIRBAG[2000/30]
English:AIR-BAGGED SEAT[2000/30]
French:SIEGE A AIR BAG[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2000National basic fee paid 
10.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
02.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/09]
18.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH07215159  ;
 [X]JPH10129382  ;
 [XA]EP0818363  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 * * column 3, line 29 - column 6, line 29 * * abstract * [A] 2;
 [X]JPH1053089  ;
 [X]JPH10152013  ;
 [X]JPH0986327  ;
 [A]JPH09150706  ;
 [A]WO9731804  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 20 *;
 [A]GB2296476  (IKEDA BUSSAN CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * pages 1-4 * * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - page 6, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0856439  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 9 * * abstract *;
 [A]JPH10194067
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07215159 A 19950815 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10129382 A 19980519 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10053089 A 19980224 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO LTD;NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10152013 A 19980609 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09086327 A 19970331 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09150706 A 19970610 (ARACO CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10194067 A 19980728 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *