EP1138720 - OPTICAL POLYCARBONATE RESIN MOLDING MATERIAL AND OPTICAL DISK SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2008/12] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOHI, Yutaka, Teijin Chemicals, Ltd 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Stuart Andrew, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/40] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99937085.1 | 17.08.1999 | [2001/40] | WO1999JP04417 | Priority number, date | JP19980231638 | 18.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23163898 | JP19980362150 | 21.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36215098 | [2001/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0011086 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1138720 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138720 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, C08G64/20, G11B7/24 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
G11B7/2534 (EP,KR);
C08L69/00 (EP,KR);
G11B2220/2537 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/40] | Title | German: | POLYCARBONAT FORMASSE FÜR OPTISCHE VERWENDUNG UND SUBSTRAT FÜR OPTISCHE PLATTE | [2001/40] | English: | OPTICAL POLYCARBONATE RESIN MOLDING MATERIAL AND OPTICAL DISK SUBSTRATE | [2001/40] | French: | MATIERE DE MOULAGE EN RESINE DE POLYCARBONATE OPTIQUE ET SUBSTRAT DE DISQUE OPTIQUE | [2001/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2001 | Translation filed | 06.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2009
02.12.2009
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 02
25.11.2009
02.12.2009
ADMISSIBLE Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP Opponent's representative Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2009
02.12.2009
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
02
25.11.2009
02.12.2009
ADMISSIBLE Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP Opponent's representative Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2010/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2009
02.12.2009
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
25.11.2009
02.12.2009
ADMISSIBLE Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP Opponent's representative Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2010/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2009
Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 13.01.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.08.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.05.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.07.2014 | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.06.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/41] | 16.07.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | IE | 17.08.2009 | LU | 17.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 17.08.2009 | ||
LU | 17.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 17.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0894816 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-3,6,9,20* examples 1-5; claim 1 * | International search | [X]JPS6190345 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [X]JPS63278929 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD); | [X]JPS63316313 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH01146926 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JPH05186583 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD); | [X]JPH05239334 (GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD); | [X]JPH06234845 (GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD); | [X]JPH06306161 (BAYER AG); | [X]JPH07165929 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [X]JPH07179596 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [X]JPH07309940 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [X]JPH09208684 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH10152553 (UBE INDUSTRIES) |