EP1024476 - SPEECH RECOGNIZING DEVICE AND METHOD, NAVIGATION DEVICE, PORTABLE TELEPHONE, AND INFORMATION PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAMINO, Katsuki, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99937091.9 | 17.08.1999 | [2000/31] | WO1999JP04424 | Priority number, date | JP19980230982 | 17.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23098298 | [2000/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010160 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024476 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10L11/00 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
G01C21/36 (EP);
G10L15/183 (KR);
G10L15/26 (EP);
H04M1/271 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SPRACHERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN, NAVIGATIONSVORRICHTUNG, TRAGBARES TELEFON, UND INFORMATIONSPROZESSOR | [2000/31] | English: | SPEECH RECOGNIZING DEVICE AND METHOD, NAVIGATION DEVICE, PORTABLE TELEPHONE, AND INFORMATION PROCESSOR | [2000/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE, DISPOSITIF DE NAVIGATION, TELEPHONE PORTABLE ET PROCESSEUR D'INFORMATIONS | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2000 | Translation filed | 10.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 16.01.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH077273B ; | [Y]JPH0236960B ; | [Y]JPH09114489 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH02305159 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH0440557 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A] - LUDWIG A. SCHMID, "Parsing Word Graphs Using A Linguistic Grammar and A Statistical Language Model", PROC. ON 1994 IEEE INTERN. CONF. ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (1994), vol. 2, pages II-41 - II-44, XP002923127 |