Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100388

EP1100388 - APPARATUS FOR LOWERING INTRA-ABDOMINAL PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.09.2003  [2003/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY
1101 E. Marshall Street, MCV Campus, P.O. Box 980568
Richmond, VA 23298-0568 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Virginia Commonwealth University
1101 E. Marshall Street, MCV Campus, P.O. Box 980568
Richmond, VA 23298-0568 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SUGERMAN, Harvey Virginia Commonwealth University
Dept. of Surgery, MCV Hospitals P.O. Box 980519
Richmond, VA 23298-0519 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Lins, Edgar , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur. , et al
GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
Application number, filing date99937283.216.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US16173
Priority number, dateUS1998012160024.07.1998         Original published format: US 121600
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0004835
Date:03.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100388
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/42
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR SENKUNG DES INTRAABDOMINALEN DRUCKS[2001/21]
English:APPARATUS FOR LOWERING INTRA-ABDOMINAL PRESSURE[2001/21]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LA PRESSION INTRA-ABDOMINALE[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase23.02.2001National basic fee paid 
23.02.2001Search fee paid 
23.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/39]
20.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2001
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US3062215  (HEYNS OCKERT S)
 [A]  - SCOTT D.B. ET AL, "A Method of Abdominal Decompression in Labor", THE LANCET, (19600528), pages 1181 - 1183, XP002923337

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(60)91059-X