Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096877

EP1096877 - Apparatus for non-invasively monitoring a subject's arterial blood pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/19]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR NON-INVASIVELY MONITORING A SUBJECT'S ARTERIAL BLOOD PRESSURE
[2004/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tensys Medical, Inc.
Suite 100, 5825 Oberlin Drive San Diego
CA 92121 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Tensys Medical, Inc.
Suite 100, 5825 Oberlin Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VOSS, Gregory, I.
405 Glenmont Drive
Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US
02 / SOMERVILLE, Alvis, J.
9940 Cummins Place
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
03 / FINBURGH, Simon, E.
12113 Branicole Lane
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Enskat, Michael Antony Frank
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP
9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Enskat, Michael Antony Frank
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9, Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
Application number, filing date99937287.315.07.1999
[2001/19]
WO1999US16189
Priority number, dateUS1998012020520.07.1998         Original published format: US 120205
US1998012006920.07.1998         Original published format: US 120069
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003635
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1096877
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096877
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/022
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/19]
TitleGerman:Gerät zur nichtinvasiven Überwachung des arteriellen Blutdrucks[2004/50]
English:Apparatus for non-invasively monitoring a subject's arterial blood pressure[2004/50]
French:Dispositif de surveillance non invasive de la pression sanguine arterielle d'un sujet[2004/50]
Former [2001/19]GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTBLUTIGEN ÜBERWACHUNG VON ARTERIELLEM BLUTDRUCK
Former [2001/19]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR NON-INVASIVELY MONITORING A SUBJECT'S ARTERIAL BLOOD PRESSURE
Former [2001/19]DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE NON INVASIVE DE LA PRESSION SANGUINE ARTERIELLE D'UN SUJET
Entry into regional phase24.01.2001National basic fee paid 
24.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
25.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2005Fee for grant paid
19.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
05.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
FR08.06.2005
IT08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY15.07.2005
IE15.07.2005
LU15.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK08.09.2005
GB08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
DE01.02.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
IT08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY15.07.2005
IE15.07.2005
LU15.07.2005
FR31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK08.09.2005
GB08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
DE01.02.2006
Former [2008/18]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
IT08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY15.07.2005
IE15.07.2005
LU15.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK08.09.2005
GB08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
DE01.02.2006
Former [2007/26]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY15.07.2005
IE15.07.2005
LU15.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK08.09.2005
GB08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
DE01.02.2006
Former [2007/23]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY15.07.2005
IE15.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
LU08.08.2005
DK08.09.2005
GB08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
DE01.02.2006
Former [2006/35]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
IE15.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
DE01.02.2006
Former [2006/28]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
IE15.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/26]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
IE15.07.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/25]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
IE15.07.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/22]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
ES19.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
SE08.09.2005
Former [2005/52]FI08.06.2005
SE08.09.2005
Former [2005/50]SE08.09.2005
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0818176  (COLIN CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-8,13,15,23,28,30 * column 6, line 13 - column 8, line 24 * [A] 2,19,32,34,39,40,44;
 [X]US5273046  (BUTTERFIELD ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13,20,23,24,26,28,30 * column 6, line 16 - column 11, line 42 * * column 15, line 47 - line 50 *;
 [A]US5238000  (NIWA MINORU [JP]) [A] 1,5,8,10,11,13,15,18,19,23,24,30,31,34-38,40-43 * column 5, line 23 - column 13, line 17 *;
 [AD]WO9825511  (VITALWAVE CORP [US]) [AD] 1,14,27 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5848970