Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101129

EP1101129 - PHOTOCHROMIC OPHTHALMIC LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER CORPORATION
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KRISHNAN, Sivaram
1653 Little Meadow Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15241 / US
02 / PYLES, Robert, A.
432 Galway Drive
Bethel Park, PA 15102 / US
03 / JOHNSON, James, B.
42 Robin Drive
Washington, PA 15301 / US
04 / PIKE, Timothy, J.
3208 Elderwood Drive
Bethel Park, PA 15102 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Feldhues, Michael L.F.
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
Konzernbereich RP - Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Feldhues, Michael L.F., Dr.
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft, Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date99937318.619.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US16308
Priority number, dateUS1998012640530.07.1998         Original published format: US 126405
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0007040
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101129
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B1/10, G02C7/00, C08K5/15, C08L69/00, B29D11/00
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
TitleGerman:PHOTOCHROME OPTHALMISCHE LINSE[2001/21]
English:PHOTOCHROMIC OPHTHALMIC LENS[2001/21]
French:LENTILLE OPHTALMIQUE PHOTOCHROMIQUE[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2001National basic fee paid 
28.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
21.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/35]
26.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DPA]EP0889084  (BAYER AG [US]) [DPA] 1-17 * claims 1-16 * * page 15, line 53 - line 55 *;
 JPS615910  [ ] (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO);
 [A]WO9627496  (BMC IND INC [US]) [A] 1-3,7,9,12-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 21 - page 7, line 10 * * page 14, line 4 - page 18, line 4 *;
 [A]JPS63304083  ;
 [A]JPH07292094  ;
 [A]JPS6390555  ;
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19860616), vol. 104, no. 24, Database accession no. 208588, XP002121942 [A] 1,18 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 04, Database accession no. 1989-029240, XP002121943 & JPS63304083 A 19881212 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD; NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.) [A] 1-3,11,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07292094 A 19951107 (TEIJIN CHEM LTD) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 22, Database accession no. 1988-150592, XP002121944 & JPS6390555 A 19880421 (DAICEL CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - HATZIUS, K. ET AL, "PHASE DIAGRAM AND CRYTALLIZATION OF POLYCARBONATE/POLY-EPSILON- CAPROLACTONE BLENDS", ANGEWANDTE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE. APPLIED MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS,DE,WILEY VCH,WEINHEIM, vol. 243, ISSN 0003-3146, page 177-187, XP000685205 [A] 1,2 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/apmc.1996.052430115