Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100852

EP1100852 - IMPROVED INK JET INK COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NOHR, Ronald, Sinclair
8955 Nesbit Lakes Drive
Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US
02 / MCDONALD, John, Gavin
1472 Knollwood Terrace
Decatur, GA 30033 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99937332.720.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US16372
Priority number, dateUS19980093458P20.07.1998         Original published format: US 93458 P
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0004104
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100852
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKTINTEN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2001/21]
English:IMPROVED INK JET INK COMPOSITIONS[2001/21]
French:COMPOSITIONS A JET D'ENCRE AMELIOREES[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2001National basic fee paid 
05.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
18.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/45]
03.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5173112  (MATRICK HOWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-18 * column 2, lines 40-60 * * column 4, lines 47-68 * * column 6, lines 50-54 * * column 9, lines 15-20 *;
 [X]JPS56143274  ;
 [X]JPS63297477
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820203), vol. 006, no. 019, Database accession no. (C - 090), [X] 1-5,7,10-14,16-18 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890404), vol. 013, no. 134, Database accession no. (C - 581), [X] 1,2,6,7,10-12,15-17 * abstract *