Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102933

EP1102933 - FLUID DRIVEN PUMP AND PORTIONING CHECK VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Change - representativepublished on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHURFLO PUMP MANUFACTURING CO.
12650 Westminster Avenue
Santa Ana, CA 92706-2100 / US
[2001/22]
Inventor(s)01 / TUELL, Elden, C.
25 Esternay Drive
Foothill Ranch, Ca. 92610 / US
 [2001/37]
Former [2001/22]01 / TUELL, Elden, C.
3115 S.W. Stafford
Topeka, KS 66604-1643 / US
Representative(s)Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/23]Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Former [2002/50]Lawrence, John , et al
Barker, Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Former [2001/22]Enskat, Michael Antony Frank , et al
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9, Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
Application number, filing date99937501.727.07.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999US16908
Priority number, dateUS1998012959205.08.1998         Original published format: US 129592
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0008336
Date:17.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102933
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:F04B43/06, F04B43/10, F04B13/02, F04B7/02, F16K15/06, G01F11/32
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:FLUIDBETRIEBENE PUMPE UND PORTIONIERENDES RÜCKSCHLAGVENTIL[2001/22]
English:FLUID DRIVEN PUMP AND PORTIONING CHECK VALVE[2001/22]
French:POMPE A COMMANDE FLUIDIQUE ET CLAPET ANTI-RETOUR DOSEUR[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase02.03.2001National basic fee paid 
02.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.03.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
05.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/03]
19.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2003
31.07.200305   M06   Fee paid on   04.08.2003
31.07.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0636379  (BARD INC C R [US]) [A] 1-4,8,10,14,18 * abstract * * column 6, line 57 - column 11, line 44 * * figures 1,3-5 *;
 [A]US3039272  (FRICK CHARLES E) [A] 1-3,8,10,14,18 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 60 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]FR2488948  (EVRARD ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1-3,8,11,14,18 * page 3, line 4 - line 31 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR1439153  (DOSAPRO) [A] 1-4,14-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2621390  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 19,21 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - page 4, line 36 * * figure - *;
 [A]FR2522075  (CRAF [FR]) [A] 19 * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 17 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2044945  (LEE HUMBARD ROBERT) [A] 19,21 * page 1, column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 37; figure - *;
 [A]FR2655123  (ITAP SPA [IT]) [A] 19,21 * abstract * * figure 1 *