Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984161

EP0984161 - COMBINATION OF SHIM AND CAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.05.2007  [2007/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIOKA, Takao Itami Works
Sumitomo Electric Inds. Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP
02 / MOCHIDA, Yasushi Itami Works
Sumitomo Electric Inds. Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date99938041.315.03.1999
[2000/10]
WO1999JP01248
Priority number, dateJP1998007046619.03.1998         Original published format: JP 7046698
JP1998009919410.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9919498
[2000/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9947810
Date:23.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0984161
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.09.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:F04B9/04, F16H53/06, F02M59/10
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:KOMBINATION VON DISTANZSCHEIBE UND NOCKE[2000/10]
English:COMBINATION OF SHIM AND CAM[2000/10]
French:COMBINAISON DE CALE ET DE CAME[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase23.07.1999Translation filed 
23.07.1999National basic fee paid 
28.07.1999Search fee paid 
23.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
27.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/19]
14.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
20.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0651140  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 4, line 21 - line 26 * * page 5, line 41 - line 47 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4213815  (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2 *
International search[Y]JPH0735778U
 [Y]JPH05340213
 [Y]JPS63289306
 [Y]JPH062511
 [Y]JPH06137404
 [Y]JPH0798052