EP1040346 - SOLID ELECTROLYTE GAS SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/40] | GAS SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD | ||
[2007/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/16] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Jens, Stefan P.O. Box 2867 Anderson, SC 29622 / US | 02 /
NEUMANN, Harald Lehmenstrasse 29/1 D-71665 Vaihingen / DE | 03 /
RIEGEL, Johann Eichenweg 27 D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 04 /
STANGLMEIER, Frank Ellen-Key-Weg 8 D-71696 Moeglingen / DE | 05 /
SCHUMANN, Bernd Daimlerstrasse 23 D-71277 Rutesheim / DE | [2000/40] | Application number, filing date | 99938187.4 | 12.06.1999 | [2000/40] | WO1999DE01727 | Priority number, date | DE1998133087 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19833087 | [2000/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005573 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040346 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040346 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/407 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
G01N27/4075 (EP,US);
G01N27/4071 (EP,US);
G01N27/4077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/40] | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYT-GASSENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2007/44] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTE GAS SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD | [2007/44] | French: | DETECTEUR DE GAZ A ELECTROLYTE SOLIDE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2007/44] |
Former [2000/40] | GASSENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2000/40] | GAS SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD | ||
Former [2000/40] | DETECTEUR DE GAZ ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 20.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.07.2008 | [2009/30] | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0372425 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * [A] 7; | [YA]GB2066478 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-6 * page 4, line 60 - page 5, line 12; figures 1,2 * [A] 7; | [A]DE4004172 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 5, lines 4-8; figure 10 * * abstract *; | [A]DE19700700 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4408504 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 34 *; | [A]DE4100106 (R. BOSCH GMBH) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4131503 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0331050 (JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYST [JP]) [A] 1 * column 10, lines 19-34; figure 3 * |