Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102764

EP1102764 - PAROXETINE SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.07.2002  [2002/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CROWE, David SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals
Old Powder Mills Near Leigh
Tonbridge Kent TN11 9AN / GB
02 / MOORE, Stephen SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals
Old Powder Mills Near Leigh
Tonbridge Kent TN11 9AN / GB
03 / O'KEEFFE, Deirdre SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceu.
Old Powder Mills Near Leigh
Tonbridge Kent TN11 9AN / GB
04 / URQUHART, Michael SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceu.
Old Powder Mills Near Leigh
Tonbridge Kent TN11 9AN / GB
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)West, Vivien , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN9.25.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]West, Vivien , et al
GlaxoSmithKline, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date99938439.906.08.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999GB02588
Priority number, dateGB1998001731508.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817315
GB1998001731008.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817310
GB1998001733708.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817337
GB1998001730808.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817308
GB1998001731108.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817311
GB1998001731308.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817313
GB1998001732308.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817323
GB1998001733808.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817338
GB1998001731208.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817312
GB1998001736708.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817367
GB1998001732408.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817324
GB1998001731408.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817314
GB1998001733508.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817335
GB1998001731810.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817318
GB1998001731910.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817319
GB1998002383430.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9823834
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0008016
Date:17.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1102764
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D405/12, A61K31/4525
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SALZE VON PAROXETIN[2001/22]
English:PAROXETINE SALTS[2001/22]
French:SELS DE PAROXETINE[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase13.02.2001National basic fee paid 
13.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
14.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/27]
04.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0188081  (FERROSAN AS [DK]) [X] 1,9,10 * page 3, line 25 - line 28; claims 1,4-7 *;
 [X]EP0810224  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,9,10 * column 1, line 30 - line 31; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0223403  (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1,9,10 * page 4, line 8 - line 12; example - *;
 [A]WO9801424  (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * page 4, line 25; claim 1 *;
 [PX]WO9856787  (SYNTHON BV [NL]) [PX] 1,9,10 * abstract *;
 [E]WO9940084  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [E] 1,9,10 * abstract *