Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102915

EP1102915 - CONNECTOR FOR EXPANDABLE WELL SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weatherford/Lamb, Inc.
515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston
Texas 77027 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.
515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600
Houston Texas 77027 / US
Inventor(s)01 / METCALFE, Paul, David
North Wing, Bucklerburn Steading
Peterculter AB14 0NP / GB
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date99938445.609.08.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999GB02605
Priority number, dateGB1998001724608.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817246
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0008301
Date:17.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102915
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102915
Date:12.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:E21B43/08, E21B43/10
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/46]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDER FÜR EXPANDIERBARES BOHRLOCHFILTER[2001/22]
English:CONNECTOR FOR EXPANDABLE WELL SCREEN[2001/22]
French:RACCORD POUR FILTRE DE PUITS EXTENSIBLE[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2001National basic fee paid 
16.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
21.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2003Fee for grant paid
11.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45]
Request for further processing for:25.07.2003Request for further processing filed
01.08.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.08.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT12.11.2003
NL12.11.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2004/33]NL12.11.2003
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO9717524  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [AD] 1,15 * page 9, line 23 - line 26; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0659975  (NAGAOKA KK [JP]) [A] 1,15 * column 7, line 36 - line 58; figure 8 *;
 [A]US4754807  (LANGE UDO [DE]) [A] 1,15 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9822690  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [A] 1,15 * figures 1,2 *