Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049033

EP1049033 - APPARATUS FOR INDICATING STRENGTH OF BUILDING STRUCTURE, AND RECORDING MEDIUM FOR STRENGTH INDICATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  18.07.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushikikaisha Enu - Shi - Enu
1011, Makimo Mino-shi
Gifu-ken 501-3700 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Kabushikikaisha Enu - Shi - Enu
1011, Makimo
Mino-shi, Gifu-ken 501-3700 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ITO, Hiromichi, Kabushikikaisha Enu -
Shi &bull, Enu, 1011, Makino
Mino-shi, Gifu-ken 501-3700 / JP
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Alton, Andrew
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/47]Alton, Andrew
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2000/44]Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr.
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB
Application number, filing date99938530.519.08.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999JP04460
Priority number, dateJP1998025037019.08.1998         Original published format: JP 25037098
[2000/44]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0011580
Date:02.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049033
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000
[2000/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.03.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUM ANGEBEN DER WIDERSTANDSFÄHIGKEIT EINES GEBÄUDES UND AUFNAHMEMEDIUM ZUR WIEDERGABE DIESES PROGRAMMS[2000/44]
English:APPARATUS FOR INDICATING STRENGTH OF BUILDING STRUCTURE, AND RECORDING MEDIUM FOR STRENGTH INDICATION PROGRAM[2000/44]
French:APPAREIL POUR INDIQUER LA RESISTANCE D'UNE CONSTRUCTION, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR PROGRAMME D'INDICATION DE LA RESISTANCE[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase17.04.2000Translation filed 
19.04.2000National basic fee paid 
19.04.2000Search fee paid 
19.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
14.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2005Date of oral proceedings
28.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/34]
28.07.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.04.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/34]
Appeal following examination28.09.2005Appeal received No.  T1567/05
07.12.2005Statement of grounds filed
30.04.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
30.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
15.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
22.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH0822479  ;
 [PY]JPH1185818  ;
 [Y]JPH06119418  ;
 [Y]JPS59163665  ;
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08022479 A 19960123 (MISAWA HOMES CO LTD) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 8,11,12 *
 [PY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11085818 A 19990330 (SEKISUI HOUSE LTD) [PY] 1-14 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940729), vol. 018, no. 409, Database accession no. (P - 1779), & JP06119418 A 19940428 (FUJI ELELCTROCHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 12,15 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850123), vol. 009, no. 016, Database accession no. (P - 329), & JP59163665 A 19840914 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DUDEK R ET AL, "An efficient approach to predict solder fatigue life and its application to SM- and area array components", ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 47TH SAN JOSE, CA, USA 18-21 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970518), ISBN 0-7803-3857-X, pages 462 - 471, XP010234082 [Y] 1-14 * figures 4,5,8,11,14,15 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECTC.1997.606210
International search[X]JPS59163665  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND)