Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1049033 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1049033



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 751
17.07.2008 Closing of application Search / examination 2
09.07.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.07.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 11
06.05.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
30.04.2008 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 10
05.04.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.04.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.03.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
31.03.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
15.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.01.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 5
02.01.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.03.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.01.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.12.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.12.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 25
13.12.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 77
13.12.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 77
07.12.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 69
30.09.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.09.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.09.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.09.2005 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.08.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.07.2005 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
28.07.2005 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
28.07.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
28.07.2005 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
28.07.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 14
28.07.2005 Means of redress Search / examination 1
28.07.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.07.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.07.2005 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.01.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
27.01.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
27.01.2005 Description Search / examination 6
27.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 2
27.01.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
21.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 2
20.01.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 18
11.01.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
11.01.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.01.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.12.2004 Annex Search / examination 3
28.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
28.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
28.12.2004 Description Search / examination 5
28.12.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.12.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
23.12.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 19
07.10.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.09.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
28.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 10
28.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
28.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 16
28.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 7
28.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 13
28.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
28.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
28.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
28.09.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.09.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
28.04.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
14.04.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
14.04.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.11.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.10.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
23.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
23.09.2003 Description Search / examination 5
23.09.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
19.09.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 18
14.05.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
14.05.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.09.2002 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
20.09.2002 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
19.08.2002 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
13.08.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
13.08.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.08.2002 European search report Search / examination 2
20.09.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.07.2000 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
04.05.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
04.05.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
19.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
19.04.2000 Description Search / examination 19
19.04.2000 Drawings Search / examination 8
19.04.2000 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
19.04.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.04.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
17.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
17.04.2000 Description Search / examination 19
17.04.2000 Drawings Search / examination 8
17.04.2000 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.04.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
17.04.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.03.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.03.2000 Priority document Search / examination 28
02.03.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.03.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 24