Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095169

EP1095169 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A POWDER AEROSOL AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 28.01.2004  [2004/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BRANSTON, David-Walter
Holzleite 23
D-91090 Effeltrich / DE
02 / LINS, Günter
Dompfaffstrasse 16
D-91056 Erlangen / DE
03 / VERLEGER, Jobst
Wilhelminenstrasse 52
D-91052 Erlangen / DE
 [2001/18]
Application number, filing date99939326.715.06.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999DE01745
Priority number, dateDE199812655015.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19826550
[2001/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9966096
Date:23.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095169
Date:02.05.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1095169
Date:02.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C23C4/12, C23C16/44
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES PULVERAEROSOLS SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG[2001/18]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A POWDER AEROSOL AND USE THEREOF[2001/18]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN AEROSOL PULVERULENT, AINSI QUE SON UTILISATION[2001/18]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2000National basic fee paid 
16.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/18]
01.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2002Fee for grant paid
04.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL02.05.2002
ES28.11.2002
[2004/05]
Former [2003/10]NL02.05.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]DE3417439  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 10; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0411499  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,9 * page 3, column 4, line 50 - line 56; figures 1-6; claims 1-24 * * page 4, column 5, line 17 - line 18 * * page 4, column 6, line 10 *;
 [A]JPH08158033  ;
 [A]EP0441300  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,12 * figure 1; example 1; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]DE3729391  (ERNO RAUMFAHRTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6,11 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 42; figure 1; claims 1-14 *;
 [A]DE3937983  (LSG LOET UND SCHWEISSGERAETE G [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figure 1; claims 1-6 *;
 [AD]WO9603216  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [AD] 3,7-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 3; figures 1-7; claims 1-20 *;
 [A]WO9503872  (EURATOM [LU], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08158033 A 19960618 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract *