EP1088209 - FIBRE OPTIC DETECTION DEVICE FOR FORCES OR STRAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | [2001/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÜRSTENAU, Norbert Berliner Heerstrasse 15a D-38104 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Markus Hoher Turm 25 D-31137 Hildesheim / DE | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur., et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 99939336.6 | 16.06.1999 | [2001/14] | WO1999DE01755 | Priority number, date | DE1998127389 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19827389 | [2001/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9967613 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088209 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088209 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/24, G01M11/08 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
G01L1/242 (EP);
G01M11/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2001/14] | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHE DETEKTIONSANORDNUNG FÜR KRÄFTE ODER SPANNUNGEN | [2001/14] | English: | FIBRE OPTIC DETECTION DEVICE FOR FORCES OR STRAINS | [2001/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF A FIBRES OPTIQUES POUR DETECTER DES FORCES OU DES TENSIONS | [2004/23] |
Former [2001/14] | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION POUR FORCES OU TENSIONS | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.11.2004 | [2006/13] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5649035 (ZIMMERMAN BERND DIETER [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4947693 (SZUCHY NICHOLAS C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |