Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095155

EP1095155 - METHODS FOR ENHANCING THE CONTENT OF SULFUR COMPOUNDS IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/18]MEANS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING THE CONTENT OF SULFUR COMPOUNDS IN PLANTS
[2005/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/17]For all designated states
MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER WISSENSCHAFTEN E.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
Former [2006/10]For all designated states
MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER WISSENSCHAFTEN E.V.
14195 Berlin / DE
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER WISSENSCHAFTEN E.V.
14195 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HESSE, Holger
Hackerstrasse 27
D-12161 Berlin / DE
02 / HARMS, Karsten
Alt-Nowawes 24
D-14482 Potsdam / DE
03 / HÖFGEN, Rainer
Storchenhof 6
D-14476 Golm / DE
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/18]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99939378.807.07.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999EP04784
Priority number, dateEP1998011255307.07.1998         Original published format: EP 98112553
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001833
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095155
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1095155
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12P13/12
[2005/26]
Former International [2001/18]C12N15/82, C12N15/54, C12N15/60, C12N9/10, C12N9/88, A01H5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RO21.02.2001
SI21.02.2001
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES GEHALTES AN SCHWEFELVERBINDUNGEN IN PFLANZEN[2005/26]
English:METHODS FOR ENHANCING THE CONTENT OF SULFUR COMPOUNDS IN PLANTS[2005/26]
French:PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA TENEUR EN COMPOSES SULFURES DES PLANTES[2005/26]
Former [2001/18]MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES GEHALTES AN SCHWEFELVERBINDUNGEN IN PFLANZEN
Former [2001/18]MEANS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING THE CONTENT OF SULFUR COMPOUNDS IN PLANTS
Former [2001/18]MOYENS ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA TENEUR EN COMPOSES SULFURES DES PLANTES
Entry into regional phase31.01.2001National basic fee paid 
31.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
03.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2005Date of oral proceedings
08.06.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2005Fee for grant paid
25.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.2002
31.07.200305   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2003
Licence(s)ID:01 00/exclusive
For:[AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE]
Licencee:Biogemma SAS
1, rue Edouard Colonne
75001 Paris / FR
Date:22.02.2006
[2006/16]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
CY08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
NL08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
GR09.06.2006
IE07.07.2006
LU07.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
PT08.08.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
NL08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
GR09.06.2006
IE07.07.2006
LU07.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
PT08.08.2006
Former [2008/21]AT08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
NL08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
GR09.06.2006
IE07.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
PT08.08.2006
Former [2007/31]AT08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
NL08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
IE07.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
PT08.08.2006
Former [2007/23]AT08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
NL08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
SE08.06.2006
MC31.07.2006
PT08.08.2006
Former [2006/45]AT08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
NL08.03.2006
SE08.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT08.03.2006
CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
Former [2006/42]CH08.03.2006
FI08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
Former [2006/36]FI08.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH0638770  ;
 [DA]  - SAITO ET AL, "modulation of cysteine biosynthesis in chloroplasts of transgenic tobacco overexpressing cysteine synthase (O-Acetylserine(thiol)-lyase)", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, no. 106, ISSN 0032-0889, page 887-895, XP002078205 [DA] 1-22 * abstract, page 891,893,894;Fig. 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.106.3.887
 [DA]  - YOUSSEFIAN ET AL, "tobacco plants transformed with the O-acetylserine (thiol) lyase gene of wheat are resistant to toxic levels of hydrogen sulphide gas", PLANT JOURNAL,GB,BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 0960-7412, page 759-769, XP002078206 [DA] 1-22 * abstract, page 766,767; Fig. 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1993.04050759.x
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 12, Database accession no. 1994-094834, XP002122801 & JPH0638770 A 19940215 (MITSUBISHI CORP) [A] 1-22 * abstract *
 [A]  - LEISH, Z., ET AL., "introduction and expression of the bacterial genes cysE and cysK in eucaryotic cells", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199303), vol. 59, no. 3, pages 892 - 898, XP000856085 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DROUX,M., ET AL., "interactions between serine acetyltransferase and O-acetylserine (thiol) lyase in higher plants - structural and kinetic properties of the free and bound enzymes", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (19980701), vol. 255, no. 1, pages 235 - 245, XP000856208 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.1998.2550235.x
 [A]  - SAITO,K., ET AL., "production of plant non-protein amino acids by recombinant enzymes of sequential biosynthetic reactions in bacteria", BIOLOGICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (199701), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 47 - 53, XP002122799 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HELL,R., "molecular physiology of plant sulfur metabolism", PLANTA, (1997), vol. 202, pages 138 - 148, XP000856032 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004250050112
 [A]  - BRUNOLD,C. AND RENNENBERG,H., "regulation of sulfur metabolism in plants: first molecular approaches", PROG. BOT., (1997), vol. 58, pages 164 - 186, XP000856058 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [T]  - BARROSO,C., ET AL., "salt-specific regulation of he cytosolic O-acetylserine (thiol) lyase gene from Arabidopsis thaliana is dependent on abscisic acid", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (199907), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 729 - 736, XP002122800 [T] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006285016296